Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 19-403
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 19-403
Title:Alabama-Coushatta Tribe of Texas, Petitioner
v.
Texas
Docketed:September 25, 2019
Linked with 19A172
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Fifth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(18-40116)
   Decision Date:March 14, 2019
   Rehearing Denied:May 24, 2019
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Aug 12 2019Application (19A172) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from August 22, 2019 to September 23, 2019, submitted to Justice Alito.
Main DocumentLower Court Orders/OpinionsLower Court Orders/OpinionsOtherOtherProof of Service
Aug 14 2019Application (19A172) granted by Justice Alito extending the time to file until September 23, 2019.
Sep 23 2019Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due October 25, 2019)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 26 2019Blanket Consent filed by Petitioner, Alabama-Coushatta Tribe of Texas.
Blanket Consent
Oct 03 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response from October 25, 2019 to December 9, 2019, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Oct 07 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including December 9, 2019.
Oct 25 2019Brief amici curiae of National Congress of American Indians, National Indian Gaming Association, and USET Sovereignty Protection Fund filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 25 2019Brief amicus curiae of Ysleta del Sur Pueblo Tribe of Texas filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 09 2019Brief of respondent State of Texas in opposition filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 20 2019Reply of petitioner Alabama-Coushatta Tribe of Texas filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 23 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/10/2020.
Jan 13 2020Petition DENIED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Allyson Ho
    Counsel of Record
Gibson, Dunn & Crutcher LLP
2100 McKinney Avenue
Suite 1100
Dallas, TX 75201

aho@gibsondunn.com
(214) 698-3100
Party name: Alabama-Coushatta Tribe of Texas
Attorneys for Respondent
Kyle Douglas Hawkins
    Counsel of Record
Texas Attorney General's Office
P.O. Box 12548 (MC 059)
Austin, TX 78711-2548

kyle.hawkins@oag.texas.gov
5129361700
Party name: State of Texas
Other
Brant C. Martin
    Counsel of Record
Wick Phillips Gould & Martin, LLP
3131 McKinney Avenue
Suite 100
Dallas, TX 75204

jhellberg@wickphillips.com
2146926200
Party name: Ysleta del Sur Pueblo Tribe of Texas
Daniel David Lewerenz
    Counsel of Record
1514 P Street NW, Suite D
Washington, DC 20005

lewerenz@narf.org
2027854166
Party name: National Congress of American Indians, National Indian Gaming Association, and USET Sovereignty Protection Fund

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543