Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 19-402
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 19-402
Title:Howard L. Baldwin, et ux., Petitioners
v.
United States
Docketed:September 25, 2019
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(17-55115, 17-55354)
   Decision Date:April 16, 2019
   Rehearing Denied:June 25, 2019
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Sep 23 2019Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due October 25, 2019)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 25 2019Blanket Consent filed by Petitioner, Howard Baldwin, et al.
Blanket Consent
Oct 17 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response from October 25, 2019 to November 25, 2019, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Oct 18 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including November 25, 2019.
Oct 23 2019Brief amicus curiae of Goldwater Institute filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 24 2019Brief amici curiae of Americans for Prosperity and Cause of Action Institute filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 24 2019Brief amicus curiae of Center for Constitutional Jurisprudence filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 25 2019Brief amicus curiae of National Right to Work Legal Defense Foundation, Inc. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 25 2019Brief amici curiae of The Cato Institute filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 25 2019Brief amicus curiae of New England Legal Foundation filed.
Proof of ServiceMain DocumentCertificate of Word Count
Nov 15 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response from November 25, 2019 to December 9, 2019, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Nov 18 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including December 9, 2019.
Dec 09 2019Brief of respondent United States of America in opposition filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word Count
Dec 23 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/10/2020.
Dec 23 2019Reply of petitioners Howard Baldwin, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 13 2020DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/17/2020.
Jan 21 2020DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/24/2020.
Feb 14 2020DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 2/21/2020.
Feb 24 2020Petition DENIED. Justice Thomas, dissenting from the denial of certiorari. (Detached Opinion)

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Aditya Dynar
    Counsel of Record
New Civil Liberties Alliance
Litigation Counsel
1225 19th Street NW Suite 450
Washington, DC 20036

adi.dynar@ncla.onmicrosoft.com
(202) 908-6202
Party name: Howard Baldwin, et al.
Attorneys for Respondent
Noel J. Francisco
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: United States of America
Other
Anthony Thomas Caso
    Counsel of Record
Center for Constitutional Jurisprudence
One University Drive
Orange, CA 92866

caso@chapman.edu
877-855-3330
Party name: Center for Constitutional Jurisprudence
Raymond J. LaJeunesse Jr.
    Counsel of Record
National Right to Work Legal Defense Foundation
8001 Braddock Rd, Suite 600
Suite 600
Springfield, VA 22151

rjl@nrtw.org
7033218510
Party name: National Right to Work Legal Defense Foundation, Inc.
John Pagliaro
    Counsel of Record
The New England Legal Foundation
150 Lincoln Street
Boston, MA 02111

johnpagliaro@nelfonline.org
617-695-3660
Party name: New England Legal Foundation
Timothy Mason Sandefur
    Counsel of Record
Goldwater Institute
500 E. Coronado Road
Phoenix, AZ 85004

tsandefur@goldwaterinstitute.org
6024625000
Party name: Goldwater Institute
Ilya Shapiro
    Counsel of Record
Cato Institute
1000 Massachusetts Ave., NW
Washington, DC 20001

ishapiro@cato.org
2028420200
Party name: The Cato Institute
John Julian Vecchione
    Counsel of Record
Cause of Action Institute
1875 Eye Street, N.W., Suite 800
Washington, DC 20006

john.vecchione@causeofaction.org
2026037372
Party name: Americans for Prosperity and Cause of Action Institute

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543