Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 19-371
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 19-371
Title:Stephen S. Wise Temple, Petitioner
v.
Julie Su
Docketed:September 19, 2019
Lower Ct:Court of Appeal of California, Second Appellate District
   Case Numbers:(B275426)
   Decision Date:March 8, 2019
   Rehearing Denied:April 2, 2019
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:June 19, 2019

DateProceedings and Orders
Sep 17 2019Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due October 21, 2019)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 03 2019Blanket Consent filed by Petitioner, Stephen Wise Temple.
Blanket Consent
Oct 14 2019Waiver of right of respondent Julie Su to respond filed.
Main Document
Oct 21 2019Brief amici curiae of State of Alaska filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 21 2019Brief amicus curiae of Union of Orthodox Jewish Congregations of America filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 23 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 11/8/2019.
Oct 24 2019Response Requested. (Due November 25, 2019)
Nov 07 2019Motion to dismiss pursuant Rule 46.2 filed by petitioner.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Nov 12 2019Letter of November 12, 2019 from counsel for respondent consenting to dismissal filed.
Main Document
Nov 15 2019Petition Dismissed - Rule 46.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Paul D. Clement
    Counsel of Record
Kirkland & Ellis LLP
1301 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20004

paul.clement@kirkland.com
2023895000
Party name: Stephen Wise Temple
Attorneys for Respondent
David Maxim Balter
    Counsel of Record
California Division of Labor Standards Enforcement, Legal Unit
455 Golden Gate Avenue, 9th Floor
San Francisco, CA 94102

dbalter@dir.ca.gov
415-703-4863
Party name: Julie Su
Other
Katherine Elizabeth Demarest
    Counsel of Record
State of Alaska Attorney General's Office
1031 W. 4th Avenue, Suite 200
Anchorage, AK 99501

kate.demarest@alaska.gov
(907) 269-5172
Party name: State of Alaska
Thomas Henderson Dupree Jr.
    Counsel of Record
Gibson, Dunn & Crutcher, LLP
1050 Connecticut Ave., NW
Washington, DC 20036

tdupree@gibsondunn.com
202-955-8500
Party name: Union of Orthodox Jewish Congregations of America

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543