Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 19-369
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 19-369
Title:Ford Motor Company, Petitioner
v.
Adam Bandemer
Docketed:September 19, 2019
Lower Ct:Supreme Court of Minnesota
   Case Numbers:(A17-1182)
   Decision Date:July 31, 2019
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Sep 18 2019Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due October 21, 2019)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 26 2019Blanket Consent filed by Petitioner, Ford Motor Company.
Blanket Consent
Oct 17 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response from October 21, 2019 to November 20, 2019, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Oct 17 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including November 20, 2019.
Oct 21 2019Brief amici curiae of The Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 21 2019Brief amicus curiae of The Alliance of Automobile Manufacturers filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Nov 20 2019Brief of respondent Adam Bandemer in opposition filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Dec 04 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/10/2020.
Dec 04 2019Reply of petitioner Ford Motor Company filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 13 2020DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/17/2020.
Jan 17 2020Petition GRANTED. The petition for a writ of certiorari in No. 19-368 is granted. The cases are consolidated, and a total of one hour is allotted for oral argument. VIDED.
Jan 17 2020Because the Court has consolidated these cases for briefing and oral argument, future filings and activity in the cases will now be reflected on the docket of No. 19-368. Subsequent filings in these cases must therefore be submitted through the electronic filing system in No. 19-368. Each document submitted in connection with one or more of these cases must include on its cover the case number and caption for each case in which the filing is intended to be submitted. Where a filing is submitted in fewer than all of the cases, the docket entry will reflect the case number(s) in which the filing is submitted; a document filed in all of the consolidated cases will be noted as “VIDED.”
Feb 21 2020SET FOR ARGUMENT on Monday, April 27, 2020. VIDED.
Feb 26 2020Record requested from the Supreme Court of Minnesota.
Feb 26 2020The record received from the Supreme Court of Minnesota, the record has been electronically filed.
Mar 06 2020Brief amicus curiae of DRI - The Voice Of The Defense Bar filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 09 2020Record received from the U.S.D.C. Todd County District Court of Minnesota. (1-Box)
Mar 19 2020CIRCULATED
Apr 03 2020ORAL ARGUMENT POSTPONED. VIDED.
Apr 13 2020Argument to be rescheduled for the October Term 2020. VIDED.
Jul 13 2020SET FOR ARGUMENT on Wednesday, October 7, 2020. VIDED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Sean Marotta
    Counsel of Record
Hogan Lovells US LLP
555 Thirteenth Street, N.W.
Washington, DC 20004

sean.marotta@hoganlovells.com
2026374881
Party name: Ford Motor Company
Attorneys for Respondent
Deepak Gupta
    Counsel of Record
Gupta Wessler PLLC
1900 L Street, NW
Suite 312
Washington, DC 20036

deepak@guptawessler.com
(202) 888-1741
Party name: Adam Bandemer
Kyle Wayne FarrarKaster, Lynch, Farrar & Ball LLP
1117 Herkimer Street
Houston, TX 77008

Kyle@fbtrial.com
713-221-8300
Party name: Adam Bandemer
Other
Lisa Marie Baird
    Counsel of Record
Reed Smith LLP
1001 Brickell Bay Drive
9th Floor
Miami, FL 33131

lbaird@reedsmith.com
786.747.0220
Party name: DRI - The Voice Of The Defense Bar
David R. Geiger
    Counsel of Record
Foley Hoag LLP
Seaport West
155 Seaport Boulevard
Boston, MA 02210-2600

dgeiger@foleyhoag.com
6178321124
Party name: Product Liability Advisory Counsel, Inc.
Elizabeth Catherine Kramer
    Counsel of Record
Office of the Minnesota Attorney General
445 Minnesota Street
Suite 1100
Saint Paul, MN 55101

liz.kramer@ag.state.mn.us
651-757-1010
Party name: Minnesota, Texas, 37 Other States and The District of Columbia
Vincent Gregory Levy
    Counsel of Record
Holwell Shuster & Goldberg, LLP
425 Lexington Avenue, 14th Floor
New York, NY 10017

vlevy@hsgllp.com
646-837-5120
Party name: Professors of Jurisdiction
Andrew John Pincus
    Counsel of Record
Mayer Brown LLP
1999 K Street, NW
Washington, DC 20006

apincus@mayerbrown.com
202-263-3220
Party name: The Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America, The National Association of Manufacturers, and The American Tort Reform Association
Jaime Ann Santos
    Counsel of Record
Goodwin Procter LLP
1900 N Street, NW
Washington, DC 20036

jsantos@goodwinlaw.com
2023464034
Party name: The Alliance of Automobile Manufacturers

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543