Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 19-347
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 19-347
Title:AER Advisors, Inc., et al., Petitioners
v.
Fidelity Brokerage Services, LLC
Docketed:September 17, 2019
Linked with 19A35
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the First Circuit
   Case Numbers:(18-1884)
   Decision Date:April 17, 2019
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Jul 03 2019Application (19A35) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from July 16, 2019 to September 13, 2019, submitted to Justice Breyer.
Main Document
Jul 08 2019Application (19A35) granted by Justice Breyer extending the time to file until September 13, 2019.
Sep 13 2019Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due October 17, 2019)
PetitionCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 30 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 11/15/2019.
Nov 06 2019Response Requested. (Due December 6, 2019)
Nov 19 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response from December 6, 2019 to January 6, 2020, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Nov 20 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including January 6, 2020.
Jan 06 2020Brief of respondent Fidelity Brokerage Services, LLC in opposition filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 21 2020Reply of petitioners AER Advisors Inc., et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 22 2020DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 2/21/2020.
Feb 24 2020Petition DENIED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Howard Graff
    Counsel of Record
Arent Fox LLP
1301 Avenue of the Americas
Floor 42
New York, NY 10019

howard.graff@arentfox.com
212-484-3952
Party name: AER Advisors Inc., et al.
Attorneys for Respondent
Shay Dvoretzky
    Counsel of Record
Jones Day
51 Louisiana Avenue NW
Washington, DC 20001-2113

sdvoretzky@jonesday.com
2028793474
Party name: Fidelity Brokerage Services, LLC

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543