Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 19-324
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 19-324
Title:Technology Properties Limited LLC, et al., Petitioners
v.
Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd., et al.
Docketed:September 10, 2019
Linked with 19A17
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Federal Circuit
   Case Numbers:(2018-1439, 2018-1440, 2018-1441, 2018-1444, 2018-1445)
   Decision Date:February 6, 2019
   Rehearing Denied:April 10, 2019
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Jun 27 2019Application (19A17) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from July 9, 2019 to September 7, 2019, submitted to The Chief Justice.
Main DocumentLower Court Orders/OpinionsProof of Service
Jul 03 2019Application (19A17) granted by The Chief Justice extending the time to file until September 7, 2019.
Sep 06 2019Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due October 10, 2019)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 09 2019Waiver of right of respondents LG Electronics, Inc.; LG Electronics USA, Inc. to respond filed.
Main Document
Oct 10 2019Waiver of right of respondents Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. and Samsung Electronics America, Inc. to respond filed.
Main Document
Oct 10 2019Waiver of right of respondents Nintendo of America, Inc. & Nintendo Co., Ltd. to respond filed.
Main Document
Oct 16 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 11/1/2019.
Nov 04 2019Petition DENIED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Denise Marie De Mory
    Counsel of Record
Bunsow De Mory LLP
701 El Camino Real
Redwood City, CA 94063

ddemory@bdiplaw.com
650 351 7248
Party name: Technology Properties Limited LLC,, et al.
Attorneys for Respondents
James M. Heintz
    Counsel of Record
DLA Piper LLP
One Fountain Square
11911 Freedom Drive, Suite 300
Reston, VA 20190-5602

jim.heintz@dlapiper.com
703.773.4148
Party name: Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. and Samsung Electronics America, Inc.
Matthew J. BrighamCooley, LLP
3175 Hanover Street
Palo Alto, CA 94304

mbrigham@cooley.com
650-843-5000
Party name: Nintendo of America, Inc. & Nintendo Co., Ltd.
Joseph B. WardenFish & Richardson, P.C.
222 Delaware Avenue, 17th Floor
Wilimington, DE 19899-1114

warden@fr.com
302-778-5424
Party name: LG Electronics, Inc.; LG Electronics USA, Inc.

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543