SEARCH TIPS
ADVANCED SEARCH
DOCKET SEARCH
Search
Toggle navigation
OPINIONS
Opinions of the Court
Opinions Relating to Orders
In-Chambers Opinions
U. S. Reports
Online Sources Cited in Opinions
Media Files Cited in Opinions
Case Citation Finder
FILING & RULES
Electronic Filing
Rules and Guidance
Supreme Court Bar
ORAL ARGUMENTS
Argument Transcripts
Argument Audio
Calendars and Lists
Courtroom Seating
CASE DOCUMENTS
Docket Search
Orders of the Court
Orders by Circuit
Granted/Noted Cases List
Journal
NEWS MEDIA
Services for News Media
Press Releases
Media Advisories
Press Credentials
Speeches
A Reporter's Guide to Applications
Chief Justice's Year-End Reports on the Federal Judiciary
ABOUT THE COURT
Justices
Supreme Court at Work
Code of Conduct for Justices
History and Traditions
The Supreme Court Building
Visiting the Court
Activities for Students & Families
Exhibitions
Building Regulations
Frequently Asked Questions
Home
>
Search Results
Docket for 19-322
Search documents in this case:
Search
No. 19-322
Title:
The Medical Center at Elizabeth Place, LLC, Petitioner
v.
Atrium Health System, et al.
Docketed:
September 9, 2019
Lower Ct:
United States Court of Appeals for the Sixth Circuit
Case Numbers:
(17-3863)
Decision Date:
April 25, 2019
Rehearing Denied:
June 7, 2019
Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Date
Proceedings and Orders
Sep 05 2019
Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due October 9, 2019)
Petition
Appendix
Certificate of Word Count
Proof of Service
Sep 10 2019
Waiver of right of respondents Atrium Health System, et al. to respond filed.
Main Document
Sep 25 2019
DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 10/11/2019.
Oct 15 2019
Petition DENIED.
NAME
ADDRESS
PHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Richard Arthur Ripley
Counsel of Record
Ruyak Cherian LLP
1700 K Street, N.W.
Suite 810
Washington, DC 20006
rickr@ruyakcherian.com
202-838-1569
Party name: The Medical Center at Elizabeth Place, LLC
Attorneys for Respondents
Shay Dvoretzky
Counsel of Record
Jones Day
51 Louisiana Avenue NW
Washington, DC 20001-2113
sdvoretzky@jonesday.com
2028793474
Party name: Atrium Health System, et al.
{1}
##LOC[OK]##
{1}
##LOC[OK]##
##LOC[Cancel]##
{1}
##LOC[OK]##
##LOC[Cancel]##