SEARCH TIPS
Search term too short
Invalid text in search term. Try again
ADVANCED SEARCH
DOCKET SEARCH
Search
Toggle navigation
OPINIONS
Opinions of the Court
Opinions Relating to Orders
In-Chambers Opinions
U. S. Reports
Online Sources Cited in Opinions
Media Files Cited in Opinions
Case Citation Finder
FILING & RULES
Electronic Filing
Rules and Guidance
Supreme Court Bar
ORAL ARGUMENTS
Argument Transcripts
Argument Audio
Calendars and Lists
Courtroom Seating
CASE DOCUMENTS
Docket Search
Orders of the Court
Orders by Circuit
Granted/Noted Cases List
Journal
NEWS MEDIA
Services for News Media
Press Releases
Media Advisories
Press Credentials
Speeches
A Reporter's Guide to Applications
Chief Justice's Year-End Reports on the Federal Judiciary
ABOUT THE COURT
Justices
Supreme Court at Work
Code of Conduct for Justices
History and Traditions
The Supreme Court Building
Visiting the Court
Activities for Students & Families
Exhibitions
Building Regulations
Frequently Asked Questions
Home
>
Search Results
Docket for 19-306
Search documents in this case:
Search
No. 19-306
Title:
Cushman & Wakefield, Inc., Petitioner
v.
Yury Rinsky
Docketed:
September 5, 2019
Linked with 19A3
Lower Ct:
United States Court of Appeals for the First Circuit
Case Numbers:
(18-1302)
Decision Date:
March 8, 2019
Rehearing Denied:
April 8, 2019
Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Date
Proceedings and Orders
Jun 26 2019
Application (19A3) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from July 7, 2019 to September 5, 2019, submitted to Justice Breyer.
Main Document
Proof of Service
Jun 28 2019
Application (19A3) granted by Justice Breyer extending the time to file until September 5, 2019.
Sep 05 2019
Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due October 7, 2019)
Petition
Appendix
Certificate of Word Count
Proof of Service
Sep 26 2019
Brief of respondent Yury Rinsky in opposition filed.
Main Document
Certificate of Word Count
Proof of Service
Oct 15 2019
Reply of petitioner Cushman & Wakefield, Inc. filed. (Distributed)
Main Document
Certificate of Word Count
Proof of Service
Oct 16 2019
DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 11/1/2019.
Nov 04 2019
Petition DENIED.
NAME
ADDRESS
PHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Evan Andrew Young
Counsel of Record
Baker Botts L.L.P.
98 San Jacinto Boulevard
Suite 1500
Austin, TX 78701-4078
evan.young@bakerbotts.com
5123222506
Party name: Cushman & Wakefield, Inc.
Attorneys for Respondent
Mark D. Szal
Counsel of Record
Szal Law Group LLC
6 Liberty Square #330
Boston, MA 02109
mark@szallawgroup.com
617-830-2494
Party name: Yury Rinsky
{1}
##LOC[OK]##
{1}
##LOC[OK]##
##LOC[Cancel]##
{1}
##LOC[OK]##
##LOC[Cancel]##