Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 19-286
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 19-286
Title:Cranston Police Retirees Action Committee, Petitioner
v.
City of Cranston, Rhode Island
Docketed:September 4, 2019
Lower Ct:Supreme Court of Rhode Island
   Case Numbers:(2017-36)
   Decision Date:June 3, 2019
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Aug 30 2019Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due October 4, 2019)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 09 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response from October 4, 2019 to November 4, 2019, submitted to The Clerk.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Sep 11 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including November 4, 2019.
Nov 04 2019Brief of respondent The City of Cranston in opposition filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Patrick J. Sullivan
    Counsel of Record
Sullivan and Sullivan
300 Centerville Road
Suite 300W
Warwick, RI 02886

patrick@sullivan-attorneys.com
4018237991
Party name: Cranston Police Retirees Action Committee
Attorneys for Respondent
William Keeley Wray Jr.
    Counsel of Record
Adler Pollock & Sheehan, PC
One Citizens Plaza, 8th Floor
Providence, RI 02903

wkwray@gmail.com
4014475881
Party name: The City of Cranston

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543