Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 19-285
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 19-285
Title:Jerud Butler, Petitioner
v.
Board of County Commissioners for San Miguel County, et al.
Docketed:September 3, 2019
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(18-1012)
   Decision Date:March 29, 2019
   Rehearing Denied:June 4, 2019
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Sep 03 2019Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due October 3, 2019)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 16 2019Blanket Consent filed by Petitioner, Jerud Butler.
Blanket Consent
Sep 20 2019Blanket Consent filed by Respondents, Board of County Commissioners for San Miguel County, et al.
Blanket Consent
Sep 20 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response from October 3, 2019 to November 4, 2019, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Sep 27 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including November 4, 2019.
Oct 01 2019Brief amicus curiae of National Whistleblower Center filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Oct 02 2019Brief amicus curiae of Center for Constitutional Jurisprudence filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountCertificate of Word Count
Oct 03 2019Amicus brief of First Amendment Scholars not accepted for filing. (October 03, 2019 -- Corrected version to be submitted)
Oct 03 2019Brief amicus curiae of First Amendment Clinic at Duke Law School filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Oct 03 2019Brief amicus curiae of Government Accountability Project filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 03 2019Brief amici curiae of First Amendment Scholars filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Nov 04 2019Brief of respondents Board of County Commissioners for San Miguel County, et al. in opposition filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Nov 20 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 12/6/2019.
Nov 20 2019Reply of petitioner Jerud Butler filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Neal Kumar Katyal
    Counsel of Record
Hogan Lovells US LLP
555 Thirteenth St., N.W.
Washington, DC 20004

neal.katyal@hoganlovells.com
202 637 5600
Party name: Jerud Butler
Attorneys for Respondents
Jeffrey Lynn Driscoll
    Counsel of Record
Williams, Turner & Holmes, P.C.
744 Horizon Court, #115
Grand Junction, CO 81506

jdriscoll@wth-law.com
970-242-6262
Party name: Board of County Commissioners for San Miguel County, et al.
Other
Thomas Michael Devine
    Counsel of Record
Government Accountability Project
1612 K Street, NW, #1100
Washington, DC, DC 20902

tomd@whistleblower.org
240-888-4080
Party name: Government Accountability Project
John C. Eastman
    Counsel of Record
Center for Constitutional Jurisprudence
c/o Fowler School of Law Chapman University
One University Drive
Orange, CA 92866

jeastman@chapman.edu
877-855-3330
Party name: Center for Constitutional Jurisprudence
Stephen M. Kohn
    Counsel of Record
Kohn, Kohn and Colapinto, LLP
1710 N St NW
Washington, DC 20007

sk@kkc.com
(202) 342-6980
Party name: National Whistleblower Center
Gregory Paul Magarian
    Counsel of Record
Washington University School of Law
Box 1120
One Brookings Drive
St. Louis, MO 63105

gpmagarian@wustl.edu
314-935-3394
Party name: First Amendment Scholars
H. Jefferson Powell
    Counsel of Record
Duke Law School
First Amendment Clinic Duke Law School, 210 Science Drive
Durham, NC 27708

powell@law.duke.edu
919-613-7168
Party name: First Amendment Clinic at Duke Law School

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543