Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 19-278
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 19-278
Title:Pfizer Inc., et al., Petitioners
v.
Superior Court of California, County of Los Angeles, et al.
Docketed:September 3, 2019
Lower Ct:Court of Appeal of California, Second Appellate District
   Case Numbers:(B296917)
   Decision Date:May 13, 2019
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:July 31, 2019

DateProceedings and Orders
Aug 28 2019Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due October 3, 2019)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 25 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response from October 3, 2019 to November 4, 2019, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Sep 25 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including November 4, 2019.
Oct 03 2019Brief amici curiae of The American Tort Reform Association, The National Association of Manufacturers, The Pharmaceutical Research and Manufacturers of America and the Product Liability Advisory Council filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 23 2019Brief of respondents County of Los Angeles, et al. in opposition filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Nov 05 2019Reply of petitioners Pfizer, Inc., et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Nov 06 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 11/22/2019.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Michael Hugh McGinley
    Counsel of Record
Dechert LLP
1900 K Street, NW
Washington, DC 20006

michael.mcginley@dechert.com
202-261-3300
Party name: Pfizer, Inc., et al.
Attorneys for Respondents
Jules Burton LeBlanc IV
    Counsel of Record
Baron & Budd, P.C.
2600 CitiPlace, Suite 400
Baton Rouge, LA 70808

avezinat@baronbudd.com
2259275441
Party name: County of Los Angeles, et al.
Charles G. OrrBaron Budd, P.C.
3102 Oak Lawn Avenue
Suite 1100
Dallas, TX 75219

800.222.2766
Party name: County of Los Angeles, et al.
Other
John H. Beisner
    Counsel of Record
Skadden, Arps, Slate, Meagher & Flom LLP
1440 New York Avenue, N.W.
Washington, DC 20005

john.beisner@skadden.com
202-371-7000
Party name: The American Tort Reform Association, The National Association of Manufacturers, The Pharmaceutical Research and Manufacturers of America and the Product Liability Advisory Council

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543