Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 19-27
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 19-27
Title:Mark Cheeseman, Petitioner
v.
Joseph Polillo, Chief of Police, City of Glassboro, New Jersey, et al.
Docketed:July 2, 2019
Lower Ct:Superior Court of New Jersey, Appellate Division
   Case Numbers:(A-2412-17T2)
   Decision Date:November 8, 2018
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:May 3, 2019

DateProceedings and Orders
Jun 28 2019Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due August 1, 2019)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 18 2019Brief amicus curiae of Coalition of New Jersey Firearm Owners filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 01 2019Motion for leave to file amici brief filed by Firearms Policy Coalition, Firearms Policy Foundation, California Gun Rights Foundation, Second Amendment Foundation.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 14 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 10/1/2019.
Aug 14 2019Waiver of right of respondent John Polillo to respond filed.
Main Document
Aug 19 2019Response Requested. (Due September 18, 2019)
Sep 16 2019Brief of respondents John Polillo in opposition filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
David D. Jensen
    Counsel of Record
David Jensen PLLC
111 John Street
Suite 420
New York, NY 10038

david@djensenpllc.com
212-380-6615
Party name: Mark Cheeseman
Attorneys for Respondents
Shannon Marie Cornelius
    Counsel of Record
Gloucester County Prosecutor's Office
70 Hunter Street
Woodbury, NJ 08096

scornelius@co.gloucester.nj.us
856-384-5500
Party name: John Polillo
Dana R. AntonGloucester County Prosecutor's Office
P.O. Box 623
Woodbury, NJ 08080

danton@co.glouchester.njus
856-384-5569
Party name: John Polillo
Other
Joseph Gary Samuel Greenlee
    Counsel of Record
Firearms Policy Coalition
1215 K Street, 17th Floor
Sacramento, CA 95814

josephgreenlee@gmail.com
9704853303
Party name: Firearms Policy Coalition, Firearms Policy Foundation, California Gun Rights Foundation, Second Amendment Foundation
Stephen Dean Stamboulieh
    Counsel of Record
Stamboulieh Law, PLLC
PO Box 4008
Madison, MS 39130

stephen@sdslaw.us
601-852-3440
Party name: Coalition of New Jersey Firearm Owners

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543