Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 19-267
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 19-267
Title:Our Lady of Guadalupe School, Petitioner
v.
Agnes Morrissey-Berru
Docketed:August 29, 2019
Linked with 19A80
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(17-56624)
   Decision Date:April 30, 2019
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Jul 18 2019Application (19A80) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from July 29, 2019 to August 28, 2019, submitted to Justice Kagan.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Jul 19 2019Application (19A80) granted by Justice Kagan extending the time to file until August 28, 2019.
Aug 28 2019Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due September 30, 2019)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 11 2019Brief amicus curiae of The National Catholic Educational Association filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 26 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response from September 30, 2019 to October 18, 2019, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Sep 27 2019Brief amici curiae of Professors Douglas Laycock, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 27 2019Brief amici curiae of Church of God in Christ, Inc. and Union of Orthodox Jewish Congregations of America filed. VIDED
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 27 2019Brief amici curiae of State of Alaska, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 30 2019Brief amici curiae of The Ethics & Religious Liberty Commission of the Southern Baptist Convention, et al. filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Sep 30 2019Brief amici curiae of Christian Legal Society et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 30 2019Brief amici curiae of General Conference of Seventh-day Adventists, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 30 2019Brief amicus curiae of Stephen Wise Temple filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 30 2019Brief amicus curiae of National Legal Foundation filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 01 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including October 18, 2019.
Oct 17 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response from October 18, 2019 to October 28, 2019, submitted to The Clerk.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Oct 18 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including October 28, 2019.
Oct 28 2019Brief of respondent Agnes Morrissey-Berru in opposition filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 28 2019Waiver of the 14-day waiting period under 15.5 filed.
Main Document
Oct 30 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 11/15/2019.
Nov 01 2019Reply of petitioner Our Lady of Guadalupe School filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Nov 12 2019Rescheduled.
Nov 26 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 12/13/2019.
Dec 18 2019Petition GRANTED. The petition for a writ of certiorari in No. 19-348 is granted. The cases are consolidated, and a total of one hour is allotted for oral argument. VIDED.
Dec 18 2019Because the Court has consolidated these cases for briefing and oral argument, future filings and activity in the cases will now be reflected on the docket of No. 19-267. Subsequent filings in these cases must therefore be submitted through the electronic filing system in No. 19-267. Each document submitted in connection with one or more of these cases must include on its cover the case number and caption for each case in which the filing is intended to be submitted. Where a filing is submitted in fewer than all of the cases, the docket entry will reflect the case number(s) in which the filing is submitted; a document filed in all of the consolidated cases will be noted as “VIDED.”
Jan 27 2020Blanket Consent filed by Petitioner, Our Lady of Guadalupe School. VIDED
Blanket Consent
Jan 31 2020SET FOR ARGUMENT on Wednesday, April 1, 2020. VIDED
Feb 03 2020Joint appendix filed. (Statement of costs filed.) VIDED
Main Document
Feb 03 2020Brief of petitioner Our Lady of Guadalupe School filed. VIDED
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 06 2020Brief amicus curiae of Foundation for Moral Law filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 07 2020Brief amici curiae of The Christian and Missionary Alliance, et al. filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Feb 07 2020Brief amicus curiae of Judicial Watch, Inc. filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 07 2020Brief amici curiae of COLPA, et al. filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 07 2020Brief amici curiae of State of Alaska, et al. filed (in 19-267).
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 10 2020Brief amici curiae of InterVarsity Christian Fellowship/USA, World Vision Inc., Young Life filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 10 2020Brief amici curiae of The Ethics & Religious Liberty Commission of the Southern Baptist Convention, et al. filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 10 2020Brief amicus curiae of National Catholic Educational Association filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 10 2020Brief amici curiae of Church of God in Christ, Inc. and Union of Orthodox Jewish Congregations of America filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 10 2020Brief amicus curiae of Torah Umesorah filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Feb 10 2020Brief amicus curiae of Franciscan University of Steubenville filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Feb 10 2020Brief amicus curiae of United States Conference of Catholic Bishops filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 10 2020Brief amici curiae of General Conference of Seventh-day Adventists and Jewish Coalition for Religious Liberty filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 10 2020Brief amicus curiae of Asma T. Uddin filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 10 2020Brief amicus curiae of Independent Women's Law Center filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 10 2020Brief amicus curiae of National Right to Work Legal Defense Foundation, Inc. filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 10 2020Brief amicus curiae of United States filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Feb 10 2020Brief amici curiae of American Civil Liberties Union, et al filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 10 2020Brief amicus curiae of Partnership Schools filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Feb 10 2020Brief amici curiae of Stephen Wise Temple and Milwaukee Jewish Day School filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 10 2020Brief amici curiae of Columbia International University and Sixth Mount Zion Missionary Baptist Church filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 10 2020Brief amicus curiae of American Center for Law and Justice filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 10 2020Brief amicus curiae of The Rutherford Institute filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 10 2020Brief amicus curiae of Professor John D. Inazu filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 10 2020Brief amici curiae of The Association of Classical Christian Schools, et al., filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 10 2020Brief amici curiae of Senator Mike Lee, et al. filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Feb 10 2020Brief amicus curiae of Center for Constitutional Jurisprudence filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 10 2020Brief amici curiae of Christian Legal Society, et al. filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Feb 10 2020Brief amicus curiae of Ethics and Public Policy Center filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 10 2020Brief amicus curiae of Inner Life Fund filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 10 2020Brief amici curiae of The Church of Jesus Christ of Latter-day Saints, et al. filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 10 2020Brief amici curiae of American Jewish Committee and United Synagogue of Conservative Judaism filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 10 2020Brief amicus curiae of First Liberty Institute filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 10 2020Brief amici curiae of Council for Christian Colleges and Universities and Forty Individual Religious Colleges and Universities filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 10 2020Brief amici curiae of Billy Graham Evangelical Association, et al. filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 10 2020Brief amici curiae of Professors Douglas Laycock, et al. filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 10 2020Brief amicus curiae of United States filed. VIDED. (Distributed)
Main Document
Feb 19 2020CIRCULATED
Feb 19 2020Record requested from the U.S.C.A. 9th Circuit.
Mar 04 2020Brief of respondents filed. VIDED. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 04 2020The record of the USCA 9th Circuit is available on Pacer.
Mar 10 2020Motion of the Solicitor General for leave to participate in oral argument as amicus curiae and for divided argument filed. VIDED.
Proof of ServiceMain Document
Mar 10 2020Brief amici curiae of The Freedom From Religion Foundation, et al. filed. VIDED. (Distributed)
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Mar 11 2020Brief amici curiae of Center for Inquiry, Inc., et al. filed. VIDED. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 11 2020Brief amici curiae of National Women's Law Center, et al. filed. VIDED. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 11 2020Motion of Virginia, et al. for leave to participate in oral argument as amici curiae and for divided argument filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Mar 11 2020Brief amici curiae of Virginia, et al. filed. VIDED. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 11 2020Brief amici curiae of National Employment Lawyers Association, et al. filed. VIDED. (Distributed)
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Mar 11 2020Brief amici curiae of Clergy and Laity United for Economic Justice and Bet Tzedek filed. VIDED. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 11 2020Brief amici curiae of CHILD USA, et al. filed. VIDED. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 16 2020ORAL ARGUMENT POSTPONED. VIDED.
Mar 23 2020Motion of Virginia, et al. for leave to participate in oral argument as amici curiae and for divided argument DENIED. VIDED.
Mar 23 2020Motion of the Solicitor General for leave to participate in oral argument as amicus curiae and for divided argument GRANTED. VIDED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Eric Christopher Rassbach
    Counsel of Record
The Becket Fund for Religious Liberty
1200 New Hampshire Avenue, NW
Suite 700
Washington, DC 20036

erassbach@becketlaw.org
2029550095
Party name: Our Lady of Guadalupe School
Attorneys for Respondent
Jennifer Anne Lipski
    Counsel of Record
JML Law, A Professional Law Corporation
5855 Topanga Canyon Boulevard, Suite 300
Woodland Hills, CA 91367

jennifer@jmllaw.com
818-610-8800
Party name: Agnes Morrissey-Berru
Jennifer A. LipskiJML Law
5855 Topanga Canyon Blvd., Suite 300
Woodland Hills, CA 91367

jennifer@jmllaw.com
818-610-8800
Party name: Agnes Morrissey-Berru
Other
Noel J. Francisco
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: United States
Bruce N. Cameron
    Counsel of Record
National Right to Work Legal Defense Foundation, Inc.
8001 Braddock Road, Ste. 600
Springfield, VA 22160

bnc@nrtw.org
7573524522
Party name: National Right to Work Legal Defense Foundation, Inc.
Anthony Thomas Caso
    Counsel of Record
Center for Constitutional Jurisprudence
One University Drive
Orange, CA 92866

caso@chapman.edu
877-855-3330
Party name: Center for Constitutional Jurisprudence
Frederick W. Claybrook Jr.
    Counsel of Record
Claybrook, LLC
700 Sixth St., NW, Ste.430
Washington, DC 20001

rick@claybrooklaw.com
202-250-3883
Party name: Billy Graham Evangelical Association, et al.
Frederick W. Claybrook Jr.
    Counsel of Record
Claybrook, LLC
700 Sixth St., NW, Ste.430
Washington, DC 20001

rick@claybrooklaw.com
202-250-3883
Party name: National Legal Foundation
Paul D. Clement
    Counsel of Record
Kirkland & Ellis LLP
1301 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20004

paul.clement@kirkland.com
2023895000
Party name: Stephen Wise Temple
Linda T. Coberly
    Counsel of Record
Winston & Strawn, LLP
35 West Wacker Drive
Chicago, IL 60601

lcoberly@winston.com
312-558-8768
Party name: Franciscan University of Steubenville
Katherine Elizabeth Demarest
    Counsel of Record
State of Alaska Office of the Attorney General
1031 W. 4th Avenue
Anchorage, AK 99501

kate.demarest@alaska.gov
(907) 269-5100
Party name: State of Alaska, et al.
Victoria Dorfman
    Counsel of Record
Jones Day
51 Louisiana Ave. NW
Washington, DC 20001

vdorfman@jonesday.com
(202) 879-3939
Party name: Professors Douglas Laycock, et al.
Thomas William Parker Douglas
    Counsel of Record
Douglas Law PLLC
106 East 8th Street
Holland, MI 49423

parkerdouglas66@gmail.com
801-699-7746
Party name: The National Catholic Educational Association
Thomas Henderson Dupree Jr.
    Counsel of Record
Gibson, Dunn & Crutcher, LLP
1050 Connecticut Ave., NW
Washington, DC 20036

tdupree@gibsondunn.com
202-955-8500
Party name: Church of God in Christ, Inc. and Union of Orthodox Jewish Congregations of America
John Allen Eidsmoe
    Counsel of Record
Foundation for Moral Law
One Dexter Avenue
Montgomery, AL 36104

eidsmoeja@juno.com
3343241812
Party name: Foundation for Moral Law
Patrick C Elliott
    Counsel of Record
Freedom From Religion Foundation
10 N. Henry St.
Madison, WI 53701

pelliott@ffrf.org
6083568900
Party name: The Freedom From Religion Foundation
John Patrick Elwood
    Counsel of Record
Arnold & Porter Kaye Scholer LLP
601 Massachusetts Ave., NW
Washington, DC 20001

john.elwood@arnoldporter.com
(202) 942-5992
Party name: Partnership Schools
Donald Manwell Falk
    Counsel of Record
Mayer Brown LLP
3000 El Camino Real
Palo Alto, CA 94306

dfalk@mayerbrown.com
650-331-2030
Party name: Independent Women's Law Center
Michael L. Foreman
    Counsel of Record
Penn State Law - Civil Rights Appellate Clinic
329 Innovation Blvd. , Suite 118
University Park, PA 16803

mlf25@psu.edu
814-865-3832
Party name: National Employment Lawyers Association et. al.
Leslie Carol Griffin
    Counsel of Record
University of Nevada, Las Vegas William S. Boyd School of Law
4505 S. Maryland Parkway
Box 451003
Las Vegas, NV 89154-1003

leslie.griffin@unlv.edu
7133013105
Party name: CHILD USA et al.
Richard Shawn Gunnarson
    Counsel of Record
Kirton McConkie
Key Bank Tower
36 South State Street, Suite 1900
Salt Lake City, UT 84111

sgunnarson@kmclaw.com
801-323-5907
Party name: The Church of Jesus Christ of Latter-day Saints, et al.
Sarah Michelle Harris
    Counsel of Record
Williams & Connolly LLP
725 Twelfth Street NW
Washington, DC 20005

sharris@wc.com
202-434-5000
Party name: The Ethics & Religious Liberty Commission of the Southern Baptist Convention, et al.
Toby Jay Heytens
    Counsel of Record
Office of the Attorney General
202 North Ninth Street
Richmond, VA 23219

SolicitorGeneral@oag.state.va.us
(804) 786-7240
Party name: Virginia, et al.
James L. Hirsen
    Counsel of Record
505 S. Villa Real Drive
Suite 101
Anaheim Hills, CA 92807

james@jameshirsen.com
714-614-0401
Party name: Inner Life Fund
Steffen Nathanael Johnson
    Counsel of Record
Wilson Sonsini Goodrich & Rosati
1700 K Street, NW, Fifth Floor
Washington, DC 20006

sjohnson@wsgr.com
(202) 973-8888
Party name: InterVarsity Christian Fellowship/USA, World Vision Inc., Young Life
Daniel Patrick Kearney Jr.
    Counsel of Record
Wilmer Cutler Pickering Hale & Dorr LLP
1875 Pennsylvania Avenue NW
Washington, DC 20815

Daniel.Kearney@wilmerhale.com
202-663-6285
Party name: Asma T. Uddin
Stuart J. Lark
    Counsel of Record
Sherman & Howard LLC
90 South Cascade Avenue
Suite 1500
Colorado Springs, CO 80903

slark@shermanhoward.com
719-448-4036
Party name: The Christian and Missionary Alliance, et al.
Nathan Lewin
    Counsel of Record
Lewin & Lewin, LLP
888 17th St. NW, 4th Floor
Washington, DC 20006

nat@lewinlewin.com
2028281000
Party name: COLPA, et al.
Eric D. McArthur
    Counsel of Record
Sidley Austin LLP
1501 K Street, N.W.
Washington, DC 20005

emcarthur@sidley.com
202-736-8000
Party name: General Conference of Seventh-day Adventists and Jewish Coalition for Religious Liberty
Michael Hugh McGinley
    Counsel of Record
Dechert LLP
1900 K Street, NW
Washington, DC 20006

michael.mcginley@dechert.com
202-261-3300
Party name: American Jewish Committee and United Synagogue of Conservative Judaism
Matthew T. Nelson
    Counsel of Record
Warner Norcross + Judd LLP
1500 Warner Building
150 Ottawa Avenue NW
Grand Rapids, MI 49503

mnelson@wnj.com
(616) 752-2539
Party name: Ethics and Public Policy Center
Jesse Michael Panuccio
    Counsel of Record
Boies Schiller Flexner LLP
1401 New York Ave, NW
Washington, DC 20005

jpanuccio@bsfllp.com
202 237 2727
Party name: Senator Mike Lee, et al.
Zachary Guy Parks
    Counsel of Record
Covington & Burling LLP
850 Tenth St. NW
Washington, DC 20001

zparks@cov.com
2022850524
Party name: Professor John D. Inazu
James Forrest Peterson
    Counsel of Record
Judicial Watch, Inc.
425 Third Street, SW
Suite 800
Washington, DC 20024

jpeterson@judicialwatch.org
2026465175
Party name: Judicial Watch, Inc.
Christian Mark Poland
    Counsel of Record
Bryan Cave Leighton Paisner LLP
161 N. Clark St., Suite 4300
Chicago, IL 60601

christian.poland@bclplaw.com
3126025085
Party name: Columbia International University and Sixth Mount Zion Missionary Baptist Church
Kevin K. Russell
    Counsel of Record
Goldstein and Russell, P.C.
7475 Wisconsin Avenue
Suite 850
Bethesda, MD 20814

krussell@goldsteinrussell.com
(202) 362-0636
Party name: National Women's Law Center et al.
Gene Clayton Schaerr
    Counsel of Record
Schaerr | Jaffe
1717 K Street NW, Suite 900
Washington, DC 20006

gschaerr@schaerr-jaffe.com
202-787-1060
Party name: Council for Christian Colleges and Universities and Forty Individual Religious Colleges and Universities
Jay Alan Sekulow
    Counsel of Record
American Center for Law and Justice
201 Maryland Avenue, N.E.
Washington, DC 20002

jsekulow@claglaw.com
2022485407
Party name: American Center for Law and Justice
Kelly J. Shackelford
    Counsel of Record
First Liberty Institute
2001 W Piano Pkwy
Suite 1600
Plano, TX 75075

kshackelford@firstliberty.org
972-941-4444
Party name: First Liberty Institute
Reed Neal Smith
    Counsel of Record
Christian Legal Society
8001 Braddock Rd.
Suite 302
Springfield, VA 22314

rsmith@clsnet.org
7038941081
Party name: Christian Legal Society et al.
James A. Sonne
    Counsel of Record
Religious Liberty Clinic, Stanford Law School
559 Nathan Abbott Way
Stanford, CA 94305-8610

jsonne@law.stanford.edu
(650) 723-1422
Party name: National Catholic Educational Association
Aaron Michael Streett
    Counsel of Record
Baker Botts, L.L.P.
910 Louisiana Street
Houston, TX 77002

aaron.streett@bakerbotts.com
7132291855
Party name: United States Conference of Catholic Bishops
Edward Z. Tabash
    Counsel of Record
11500 West Olympic Blvd
Suite 400
Los Angeles, CA 90064

etabash@centerforinquiry.org
3102795120
Party name: Center for Inquiry
Igor Victor Timofeyev
    Counsel of Record
Paul Hastings LLP
875 15th Street, NW
Washington, DC 20005

igortimofeyev@paulhastings.com
202-551-1792
Party name: Torah Umesorah
Misha Tseytlin
    Counsel of Record
Troutman Sanders LLP
One North Wacker Drive
Suite 2905
Chicago, IL 60606

misha.tseytlin@troutman.com
312-759-5947
Party name: The Association of Classical Christian Schools, et al.,
Heather Lynn Weaver
    Counsel of Record
Americans United for Separation of Church and Stat
915 15th Street, NW
Washington, DC 20005

hweaver@aclu.org
202-675-2330
Party name: American Civil Liberties Union, et al
John W. Whitehead
    Counsel of Record
The Rutherford Institute
109 Deerwood Road
Charlottesville, VA 22911

legal@rutherford.org
4349783888
Party name: The Rutherford Institute
Ryan Hung-Hsi WuCapstone Law APC
1875 Century Park East, Suite 1000
Los Angeles, CA 90067

ryan.wu@capstonelawyers.com
310 556-4811
Party name: Clergy and Laity United for Economic Justice and Bet Tzedek

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543