Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 19-265
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 19-265
Title:Brandon Kelly, Superintendent, Oregon State Penitentiary, Petitioner
v.
Laycelle Tornee White
Docketed:August 29, 2019
Lower Ct:Supreme Court of Oregon
   Case Numbers:(S065223)
   Decision Date:May 31, 2019
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Aug 28 2019Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due September 30, 2019)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 16 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 11/1/2019.
Oct 17 2019Response Requested. (Due November 18, 2019)
Nov 18 2019Brief of respondent White, Lycell in opposition filed.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Nov 18 2019Motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed by respondent White, Lycell.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Dec 11 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/10/2020.
Feb 26 2020DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 2/28/2020.
Feb 26 2020Motion to dismiss filed by petitioner Brandon Kelly, Superintendent, Oregon State Penitentiary.
Main Document
Mar 02 2020DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 3/6/2020.
Mar 16 2020Petition Dismissed - Rule 46.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Benjamin Noah Gutman
    Counsel of Record
Oregon Department of Justice
1162 Court Street NE
Salem, OR 97301

benjamin.gutman@doj.state.or.us
503-378-4402
Party name: Brandon Kelly, Superintendent, Oregon State Penitentiary
Attorneys for Respondent
Jeffrey Erwin Ellis
    Counsel of Record
Alsept & Ellis
621 SW Morrison St Ste 1025
Portland, OR 97205

jeffreyerwinellis@gmail.com
503 222 9830
Party name: White, Lycell
Ryan T. O'Connor
    Counsel of Record
O'Connor Weber LLC
1500 SW First Avenue, Suite 1090
Portland, OR 97201

ryan@oconnorweber.com
503-226-0923
Party name: Laycelle Tornee White

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543