Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 19-258
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 19-258
Title:Richard Lewis Katzin, et al., Petitioners
v.
United States
Docketed:August 28, 2019
Linked with 18A1328
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Federal Circuit
   Case Numbers:(2016-2636)
   Decision Date:November 19, 2018
   Rehearing Denied:March 26, 2019
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Jun 14 2019Application (18A1328) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from June 24, 2019 to August 23, 2019, submitted to The Chief Justice.
Main DocumentLower Court Orders/OpinionsProof of Service
Jun 21 2019Application (18A1328) granted by The Chief Justice extending the time to file until August 23, 2019.
Aug 23 2019Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due September 27, 2019)
PetitionCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 27 2019Waiver of right of respondent United States of America to respond filed.
Main Document
Oct 02 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 10/18/2019.
Oct 21 2019Petition DENIED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Roberto Eduardo Berrios-Falcon
    Counsel of Record
Berrios Falcon, LLC
Capital Center Building, South Tower Suite 901
239 Arterial Hostos Ave.
San Juan, PR 00918

rblawpr@yahoo.com
(787)274-8600
Party name: Richard Lewis Katzin, et al.
Attorneys for Respondent
Noel J. Francisco
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: United States of America

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543