Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 19-257
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 19-257
Title:California Trout, et al., Petitioners
v.
Hoopa Valley Tribe, et al.
Docketed:August 28, 2019
Linked with 19A92
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the District of Columbia Circuit
   Case Numbers:(14-1271)
   Decision Date:January 25, 2019
   Rehearing Denied:April 26, 2019
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Jul 19 2019Application (19A92) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from July 25, 2019 to August 26, 2019, submitted to The Chief Justice.
Main Document
Jul 23 2019Application (19A92) granted by The Chief Justice extending the time to file until August 26, 2019.
Aug 26 2019Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due September 27, 2019)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 30 2019Blanket Consent filed by Petitioner, California Trout, et al.
Blanket Consent
Sep 06 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response from September 27, 2019 to October 28, 2019, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Sep 09 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended for all respondents to and including October 28, 2019.
Sep 10 2019Waiver of right of respondent County of Siskiyou to respond filed.
Main Document
Sep 18 2019Motion of the Solicitor General to extend the time to file a response from September 27, 2019 to October 28, 2019, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Sep 19 2019Motion of the Solicitor General to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including October 28, 2019, for all respondents.
Sep 27 2019Brief amici curiae of State of Oregon, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 28 2019Brief of respondent United States in opposition filed.
Certificate of Word CountMain Document
Oct 28 2019Brief of respondent PacifiCorp in opposition filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 28 2019Brief of respondent Hoopa Valley Tribe in opposition filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Nov 06 2019Reply of petitioners California Trout, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Nov 13 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 12/6/2019.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Andrew Harry Erteschik
    Counsel of Record
Poyner Spruill LLP
P.O. Box 1801
Raleigh, NC 27602-1801

aerteschik@poynerspruill.com
919-783-2895
Party name: California Trout, et al.
Attorneys for Respondents
Noel J. Francisco
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: United States
Thane Dennis Somerville
    Counsel of Record
Morisset Schlosser Jozwiak & Somerville
811 1st Ave, Suite 218
Seattle, WA 98104

t.somerville@msaj.com
206-386-5200
Party name: Hoopa Valley Tribe
Paul S. Weiland
    Counsel of Record
Nossaman LLP
18101 Von Karman Avenue, Suite 1800
Irvine, CA 92612

pweiland@nossaman.com
949-833-7800
Party name: County of Siskiyou
Other
Benjamin Noah Gutman
    Counsel of Record
Oregon Department of Justice
1162 Court Street NE
Salem, OR 97301

benjamin.gutman@doj.state.or.us
503-378-4402
Party name: State of Oregon
Misha Tseytlin
    Counsel of Record
Troutman Sanders LLP
One North Wacker Drive
Suite 2905
Chicago, IL 60606

misha.tseytlin@troutman.com
3127591920
Party name: PacifiCorp

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543