Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 19-250
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 19-250
Title:Oklahoma, Petitioner
v.
Jesse Allen Johnson
Docketed:August 26, 2019
Lower Ct:Court of Criminal Appeals of Oklahoma
   Case Numbers:(PR 2018-1203)
   Decision Date:May 24, 2019
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Aug 22 2019Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due September 25, 2019)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 09 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 11/1/2019.
Oct 14 2019Waiver of right of respondent Jesse A. Johnson to respond filed.
Main Document
Oct 18 2019Response Requested. (Due November 18, 2019)
Nov 18 2019Brief of respondent Jesse A. Johnson in opposition filed.
Main DocumentOtherProof of Service
Nov 18 2019Motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed by respondent Jesse A. Johnson.
Main Document
Dec 02 2019Reply of petitioner Oklahoma filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 04 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/10/2020.
Feb 26 2020DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 2/28/2020.
Mar 02 2020DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 3/6/2020.
Apr 26 2021DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 4/30/2021.
May 03 2021Motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed by respondent GRANTED.
May 03 2021Petition GRANTED. Judgment VACATED and case REMANDED for further consideration in light of Jones v. Mississippi, 593 U. S. ___ (2021).
Jun 04 2021MANDATE ISSUED.
Jun 04 2021JUDGMENT ISSUED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Jennifer Michelle Hinsperger
    Counsel of Record
Oklahoma County District Attorney's Office
320 Robert S. Kerr, Suite 505
Oklahoma City, OK 73102

dajenhin@oklahomacounty.org
4057131600
Party name: Oklahoma
Attorneys for Respondent
Andrea Digilio Miller
    Counsel of Record
800 N Harvey Ave, suite 317
Oklahoma City, OK 73102

andrea.miller@oscn.net
405-208-6161
Party name: Jesse A. Johnson

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543