Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 19-221
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 19-221
Title:Michelle Valent, Petitioner
v.
Andrew M. Saul, Commissioner of Social Security
Docketed:August 20, 2019
Linked with 18A1301
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Sixth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(17-2109)
   Decision Date:March 20, 2019
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Jun 05 2019Application (18A1301) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from June 18, 2019 to August 16, 2019, submitted to Justice Sotomayor.
Jun 13 2019Application (18A1301) granted by Justice Sotomayor extending the time to file until August 16, 2019.
Aug 16 2019Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due September 19, 2019)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 26 2019Blanket Consent filed by Petitioner, Michelle Valent.
Blanket Consent
Sep 10 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response from September 19, 2019 to October 21, 2019, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Sep 11 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including October 21, 2019.
Sep 19 2019Brief amicus curiae of National Right to Work Legal Defense Foundation, Inc. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 19 2019Brief amicus curiae of Southeastern Legal Foundation filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 19 2019Brief amici curiae of Center for Constitutional Jurisprudence, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 21 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response from October 21, 2019 to November 20, 2019, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Oct 22 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including November 20, 2019.
Nov 20 2019Motion of Michelle Valent to dismiss submitted.
Main Document

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Adam Rabun Fast Gustafson
    Counsel of Record
Boyden Gray & Associates PLLC
801 17th Street, NW, Suite 350
Washington, DC 20006

gustafson@boydengrayassociates.com
2025775681
Party name: Michelle Valent
Attorneys for Respondent
Noel J. Francisco
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: Saul, Commissioner of Social Security, Andrew
Other
Anthony Thomas Caso
    Counsel of Record
Center for Constitutional Jurisprudence
One University Drive
Orange, CA 92866

caso@chapman.edu
877-855-3330
Party name: Center for Constitutional Jurisprudence, et al.
Kimberly Stewart Hermann
    Counsel of Record
Southeastern Legal Foundation
560 W. Crossville Rd.
Suite 104
Roswell, GA 30075-7509

khermann@southeasternlegal.org
770-977-2131
Party name: Southeastern Legal Foundation
Raymond J. LaJeunesse Jr.
    Counsel of Record
National Right to Work Legal Foundation
8001 Braddock Rd, Suite 600
Springfield, VA 22151

rjl@nrtw.org
703-321-8510
Party name: National Right to Work Legal Defense Foundation, Inc.

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543