Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 19-192
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 19-192
Title:Matthew Herrick, Petitioner
v.
Grindr LLC, et al.
Docketed:August 14, 2019
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Second Circuit
   Case Numbers:(18-396)
   Decision Date:March 27, 2019
   Rehearing Denied:May 9, 2019
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Aug 07 2019Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due September 13, 2019)
PetitionCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 16 2019Waiver of right of respondents Grindr LLC and KL Grindr Holdings, Inc. to respond filed.
Main Document
Aug 22 2019Waiver of right of respondent Gindr Holding Company to respond filed.
Main Document
Sep 04 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 10/1/2019.
Oct 07 2019Petition DENIED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Carrie Ann Goldberg
    Counsel of Record
C.A. Goldberg, PLLC
16 Court Street, Suite 2500
Brooklyn, NY 11241

carrie@cagoldberglaw.com
16466668908
Party name: Matthew Herrick
Attorneys for Respondents
Moez M. KabaHueston Hennigan, LLP
523 West 6th Street, Suite 400
Los Angeles, CA 90014

mkaba@hueston.com
213-788-4543
Party name: Gindr Holding Company
Daniel P. WaxmanBryan Cave Leighton Paisner, LLP
1290 Avenue of the Americas, 36th Floor
New York, NY 10104

dpwaxman@bclplaw.com
212-541-2040
Party name: Grindr LLC and KL Grindr Holdings, Inc.

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543