Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 19-185
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 19-185
Title:Kalev Mutond, et al., Petitioners
v.
Darryl Lewis
Docketed:August 12, 2019
Linked with 18A1228
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the District of Columbia Circuit
   Case Numbers:(17-7118)
   Decision Date:March 12, 2019
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
May 24 2019Application (18A1228) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from June 10, 2019 to August 9, 2019, submitted to The Chief Justice.
Main DocumentLower Court Orders/OpinionsProof of Service
May 29 2019Application (18A1228) granted by The Chief Justice extending the time to file until August 9, 2019.
Aug 09 2019Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due September 11, 2019)
PetitionCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 26 2019Waiver of right of respondent Darryl Lewis to respond filed.
Main Document
Sep 04 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 10/1/2019.
Sep 13 2019Response Requested. (Due October 15, 2019)
Sep 27 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response from October 15, 2019 to November 14, 2019, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Sep 30 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including November 14, 2019.
Oct 30 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response from November 14, 2019 to December 9, 2019, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Oct 31 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including December 9, 2019.
Dec 09 2019Brief of respondent Darryl Lewis in opposition filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 23 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/10/2020.
Dec 23 2019Reply of petitioners Kalev Mutond, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Jan 13 2020DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/17/2020.
Jan 21 2020The Solicitor General is invited to file a brief in this case expressing the views of the United States.
May 26 2020Brief amicus curiae of United States filed.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Jun 09 2020DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 6/25/2020.
Jun 09 2020Supplemental brief of respondent Darryl Lewis filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jun 15 2020Supplemental brief of petitioners Kalev Mutond, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Jun 29 2020Petition DENIED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
John Patrick Elwood
    Counsel of Record
Arnold & Porter Kaye Scholer LLP
601 Massachusetts Ave., NW
Washington, DC 20001

john.elwood@arnoldporter.com
2029425992
Party name: Kalev Mutond, et al.
Attorneys for Respondent
Pratik Arvind Shah
    Counsel of Record
Akin Gump Strauss Hauer & Feld, LLP
2001 K Street N.W.
Washington, DC 20006

pshah@akingump.com
202-887-4210
Party name: Darryl Lewis
Other
Noel J. Francisco
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: United States

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543