Docket for 19-177
|
Aug 07 2019 | Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due September 9, 2019) | | PetitionProof of Service | Aug 26 2019 | Motion to extend the time to file a response from September 9, 2019 to November 8, 2019, submitted to The Clerk. | | Main Document | Sep 03 2019 | Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including November 8, 2019. | | | Nov 08 2019 | Brief of respondents Alliance for Open Society International, Inc., et al. in opposition filed. | | Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | Nov 26 2019 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 12/13/2019. | | | Nov 26 2019 | Reply of petitioners United States Agency for Intrnational Development, et al. filed. (Distributed) | | Main DocumentCertificate of Word Count | Dec 13 2019 | Petition GRANTED. Justice Kagan took no part in the consideration or decision of this petition. | | | Jan 27 2020 | Brief of petitioners United States Agency for Intrnational Development, et al. filed. | | Main DocumentProof of Service | Jan 27 2020 | Joint appendix filed. | | Main DocumentProof of Service | Jan 31 2020 | SET FOR ARGUMENT on Wednesday, March 25, 2020. | | | Feb 03 2020 | Brief amicus curiae of American Center for Law & Justice filed. | | Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | Feb 19 2020 | CIRCULATED | | | Feb 19 2020 | Record requested from the U.S.C.A. 2nd Circuit. | | | Feb 20 2020 | Record of the USCA 2nd Circuit electronically received. | | | Feb 20 2020 | Record of the USDC Southern District of New York electronically received. | | | Feb 26 2020 | Brief of respondents Alliance for Open Society International, Inc., et al. filed. (Distributed) | | Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | Mar 04 2020 | Brief amici curiae of Current and Former Members of Congress filed. (Distributed) | | Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | Mar 04 2020 | Brief amicus curiae of Adventist Development and Relief Agency International filed. (Distributed) | | Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | Mar 04 2020 | Brief amici curiae of Professors of Public Health and Organizations Working in Public Health Policy and Implementation filed. (Distributed) | | Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | Mar 04 2020 | Brief amicus curiae of The Cato Institute filed. (Distributed) | | Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | Mar 04 2020 | Brief amicus curiae of Washington Legal Foundation filed. (Distributed) | | Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | Mar 13 2020 | Reply of petitioners Agency for International Development, et al. filed. (Distributed) | | Main DocumentProof of Service | Mar 16 2020 | ORAL ARGUMENT POSTPONED. | | | Apr 13 2020 | Argument to be rescheduled for May 2020. | | | Apr 15 2020 | RESCHEDULED FOR ARGUMENT on Tuesday, May 5, 2020. | | | May 05 2020 | Argued. For petitioners: Christopher G. Michel, Assistant to the Solicitor General, Department of Justice, Washington, D. C. For respondents: David W. Bowker, Washington, D. C. | | | Jun 29 2020 | Judgment REVERSED. Kavanaugh, J., delivered the opinion of the Court, in which Roberts, C. J., and Thomas, Alito, and Gorsuch, JJ., joined. Thomas, J., filed a concurring opinion. Breyer, J., filed a dissenting opinion, in which Ginsburg and Sotomayor, JJ., joined. Kagan, J., took no part in the consideration or decision of the case. | | | Jul 31 2020 | JUDGMENT ISSUED. | | |
|