Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 19-176
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 19-176
Title:R. David Weisskopf, Petitioner
v.
Jewish Agency for Israel, et al.
Docketed:August 8, 2019
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Second Circuit
   Case Numbers:(18-244, 18-246)
   Decision Date:March 27, 2019
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Jun 24 2019Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due September 9, 2019)
PetitionCertificate of Word CountAppendixProof of Service
Aug 12 2019Waiver of Tzipi Livni, Shmuel Chamdani, Na’ama Talman Boltin, Miriam Darmony Yazdi, Einat Gilead-Meshulam, Tomer Moskowitz, Calanit Shapira Bergman, Noa Regev, Alona Sadeh, Zeev Gabay, Ariel Lenga, Orit Avigail Yahalomi, and Michael Duwani Bahiri of right to respond not accepted for filing. (August 20, 2019)
Aug 19 2019Waiver of right of respondents Tzipi Livni, et al. to respond filed.
Main Document
Sep 25 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 10/11/2019.
Oct 15 2019Petition DENIED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
R. David Weisskopf1300 Pennsylvania Ave., NW
Suite 190-610
Washington, DC 20004

(847) 230-4756
Party name: R. David Weisskopf
Attorneys for Respondents
Robert Reeves Anderson
    Counsel of Record
Arnold & Porter Kaye Scholer LLP
370 Seventeenth Street, Suite 4400
Denver, CO 80202

Reeves.Anderson@arnoldporter.com
303-863-2325
Party name: Tzipi Livni, et al.

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543