Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 19-168
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 19-168
Title:Remington Arms Co., LLC, et al., Petitioners
v.
Donna L. Soto, Administratrix of the Estate of Victoria L. Soto, et al.
Docketed:August 5, 2019
Linked with 18A1185
Lower Ct:Supreme Court of Connecticut
   Case Numbers:(SC 19832, SC 19833)
   Decision Date:March 19, 2019
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
May 16 2019Application (18A1185) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from June 17, 2019 to August 1, 2019, submitted to Justice Ginsburg.
Main DocumentLower Court Orders/OpinionsLower Court Orders/OpinionsProof of Service
May 17 2019Application (18A1185) granted by Justice Ginsburg extending the time to file until August 1, 2019.
Aug 01 2019Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due September 4, 2019)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 23 2019Motion of Donna L. Soto, Administratrix of the Estate of Victoria L. Soto, et al. for an extension of time submitted.
Main Document

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Scott A. Keller
    Counsel of Record
Baker Botts LLP
1299 Pennsylvania Ave., NW
Washington, DC 20004

scott.keller@bakerbotts.com
2026397837
Party name: Remington Arms Co., LLC, et al.
Attorneys for Respondents
Joshua David Koskoff
    Counsel of Record
Koskoff, Koskoff & Bieder, P.C.
350 Fairfield Avenue
Bridgeport, CT 06604

JKoskoff@Koskoff.com
2033364421
Party name: Donna L. Soto, Administratrix of the Estate of Victoria L. Soto, et al.

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543