Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 19-153
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 19-153
Title:Yasmeen Daniel, Individually and as Special Administrator of the Estate of Zina Daniel Haughton, Petitioner
v.
Armslist, LLC, et al.
Docketed:August 1, 2019
Lower Ct:Supreme Court of Wisconsin
   Case Numbers:(2017AP344)
   Decision Date:April 30, 2019
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Jul 29 2019Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due September 3, 2019)
PetitionCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 19 2019Brief amici curiae of American Medical Association and Wisconsin Medical Society filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 26 2019Waiver of Armslist, LLC, et al. of right to respond not accepted for filing. (August 30, 2019)
Aug 30 2019Brief amici curiae of The Cyber Civil Rights Initiative and Legal Scholars filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 30 2019Waiver of right of respondents Armslist, LLC, et al. to respond filed.
Main Document
Sep 03 2019Brief amici curiae of National Coalition Against Domestic Violence, et al. filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Sep 11 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 10/1/2019.
Sep 18 2019Response Requested. (Due October 18, 2019)
Oct 18 2019Brief of respondents Armslist, LLC, et al. in opposition filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 31 2019Reply of petitioner Yasmeen Daniel filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Nov 06 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 11/22/2019.
Nov 25 2019Petition DENIED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Samantha Jill Katze
    Counsel of Record
Manatt, Phelps & Phillips, LLP
7 Times Square
New York, NY 10036

skatze@manatt.com
(212) 790-4500
Party name: Yasmeen Daniel
Attorneys for Respondents
Brian Adair Sutherland
    Counsel of Record
Reed Smith, LLP
101 2nd Street
San Francisco, CA 94105

bsutherland@reedsmith.com
4155438700
Party name: Armslist, LLC, et al.
Other
Anthony J Dreyer
    Counsel of Record
Skadden, Arps, Slate, Meagher & Flom LLP
Four Times Square
New York, NY 10036

anthony.dreyer@skadden.com
212-735-3000
Party name: National Coalition Against Domestic Violence, et al.
Jeffrey A. Mandell
    Counsel of Record
Stafford Rosenbaum, LLP
222 West Washington Avenue
Suite 900
Madison, WI 53701-1784

jmandell@staffordlaw.com
608-256-0226
Party name: The Cyber Civil Rights Initiative, Ann Bartow, Danielle Keats Citron, Dr. Mary Anne Franks, Woodrow Hartzog, Frank Pasquale, Neil Richards, Dr. Olivier Sylvain, Dr. Ari Ezra Waldman
Leonard A. Nelson
    Counsel of Record
American Medical Association
330 N. Wabash Avenue
Suite 39300
Chicago, IL 60611

leonard.nelson@ama-assn.org
3124645532
Party name: American Medical Association and Wisconsin Medical Society

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543