Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 19-1461
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 19-1461
Title:Mitche A. Dalberiste, Petitioner
v.
GLE Associates, Inc.
Docketed:July 7, 2020
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Eleventh Circuit
   Case Numbers:(20-11101)
   Decision Date:May 19, 2020
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Jun 24 2020Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due August 6, 2020)
PetitionCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 22 2020Blanket Consent filed by Petitioner, Mitche A. Dalberiste.
Blanket Consent
Jul 27 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response from August 6, 2020 to September 2, 2020, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Jul 27 2020Blanket Consent filed by Respondent, GLE Associates, Inc.
Blanket Consent
Jul 28 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including September 2, 2020.
Jul 31 2020Brief amici curiae of Jewish Coalition for Religious Liberty et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 05 2020Brief amicus curiae of Founders' First Freedom filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Aug 06 2020Brief amici curiae of Robert P. Roesser and National Right to Work Legal Defense Foundation, Inc. filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Aug 06 2020Brief amici curiae of Christian Legal Society, National Association of Evangelicals, Association of Christian Schools International, Institutional Religious Freedom Alliance, Queens Federation of Churches filed.
Proof of ServiceMain DocumentOtherCertificate of Word Count
Aug 06 2020Brief amici curiae of Religious Liberty Scholars et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 01 2020Brief of respondent GLE Associates, Inc. in opposition filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Sep 15 2020Reply of petitioner Mitche A. Dalberiste filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 16 2020DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 10/9/2020.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Gene Clayton Schaerr
    Counsel of Record
Schaerr | Jaffe
1717 K Street NW, Suite 900
Washington, DC 20006

gschaerr@schaerr-jaffe.com
202-787-1060
Party name: Mitche A. Dalberiste
Attorneys for Respondent
Phillip Joseph Harris
    Counsel of Record
Constangy, Brooks, Smith & Prophete, LLP
100 North Tampa Street, Suite 3350
Tampa, FL 33602

pharris@constangy.com
813-223-7166
Party name: GLE Associates, Inc.
Phillip J. HarrisConstangy, Brooks, Smith & Prophate, LLP
100 North Tampa Street
Suite 3350
Tampa, FL 33602-5832

pharris@constangy.com
813-223-7166
Party name: GLE Associates, Inc.
Other
Bruce N. Cameron
    Counsel of Record
c/o National Right to Work Legal Defense Foundation, Inc.
8001 Braddock Road, Ste. 600
Springfield, VA 22160

bnc@nrtw.org
7573524522
Party name: Robert P. Roesser and National Right to Work Legal Defense Foundation, Inc.
Walter Edward Carson Sr.
    Counsel of Record
Walter E. Carson
16141 Ed Warfield Road
Woodbine, MD 21797

wcarson@columbiaunion.net
3014558114
Party name: Founders' First Freedom
Kimberlee Wood Colby
    Counsel of Record
Christian Legal Society
8001 Braddock Rd., Suite 302
Springfield, VA 22151

kcolby@clsnet.org
703-894-1087
Party name: Christian Legal Society, National Association of Evangelicals, Association of Christian Schools International, Institutional Religious Freedom Alliance, Queens Federation of Churches
Richard Shawn Gunnarson
    Counsel of Record
Kirton McConkie
Key Bank Tower
36 South State Street, Suite 1900
Salt Lake City, UT 84111

sgunnarson@kmclaw.com
801-323-5907
Party name: Jewish Coalition for Religious Liberty et al.
Harold Douglas Laycock
    Counsel of Record
University of Virginia Law School
580 Massie Road
Charlottesville, VA 22903

DLAYCOCK@VIRGINIA.EDU
512-656-1789
Party name: Religious Liberty Scholars et al.

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543