Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 19-1458
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 19-1458
Vide 19-1434, 19-1452
Title:Arthrex, Inc., Petitioner
v.
Smith & Nephew, Inc., et al.
Docketed:July 6, 2020
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Federal Circuit
   Case Numbers:(2018-2140)
   Decision Date:October 31, 2019
   Rehearing Denied:March 23, 2020
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Jun 30 2020Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due August 5, 2020)
PetitionCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 20 2020Blanket Consent filed by Respondents, Smith & Nephew, Inc., et al. VIDED
Blanket Consent
Jul 20 2020Blanket Consent filed by Petitioner, Arthrex, Inc. VIDED
Blanket Consent
Jul 20 2020Blanket Consent filed by Respondent, United States VIDED
Blanket Consent
Jul 22 2020Memorandum of respondent United States filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Jul 23 2020Brief of respondents Smith & Nephew, Inc., et al. filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentOtherProof of Service
Aug 04 2020Brief amicus curiae of US Inventor, Inc. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 05 2020Brief amicus curiae of TiVo Corporation filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Aug 11 2020Reply of petitioner Arthrex, Inc. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 12 2020DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 9/29/2020.
Oct 05 2020DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 10/9/2020.
Oct 13 2020Petition GRANTED, the petition for a writ of certiorari in No. 19-1434 is granted as to Federal Circuit case No. 2018-2140, and the petition for a writ of certiorari in No. 19-1452 is granted, all limited to Questions 1 and 2 as set forth in the July 22, 2020 Memorandum for the United States. The cases are consolidated, and a total of one hour is allotted for oral argument. VIDED.
Oct 13 2020Because the Court has consolidated these cases for briefing and oral argument, future filings and activity in the cases will now be reflected on the docket of No. 19-1434. Subsequent filings in these cases must therefore be submitted through the electronic filing system in No. 19-1434. Each document submitted in connection with one or more of these cases must include on its cover the case number and caption for each case in which the filing is intended to be submitted. Where a filing is submitted in fewer than all of the cases, the docket entry will reflect the case number(s) in which the filing is submitted; a document filed in all of the consolidated cases will be noted as “VIDED.”

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Jeffrey Alan Lamken
    Counsel of Record
MoloLamken LLP
The Watergate, Suite 500
600 New Hampshire Ave., N.W.
Washington, DC 20037

jlamken@mololamken.com
2025562010
Party name: Arthrex, Inc.
Attorneys for Respondents
Mark Andrew Perry
    Counsel of Record
Gibson Dunn & Crutcher, LLP
1050 Connecticut Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20036-5306

mperry@gibsondunn.com
202-887-3667
Party name: Smith & Nephew, Inc., et al.
Jeffrey B. Wall
    Counsel of Record
Acting Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: United States
Other
Robert P. Greenspoon
    Counsel of Record
Flachsbart & Greenspoon, LLC
333 N. Michigan Ave
Suite 2700
Chicago, IL 60601

rpg@fg-law.com
312-551-9500
Party name: US Inventor, Inc.
Michael E. Joffre
    Counsel of Record
STERNE, KESSLER, GOLDSTEIN & Fox P.L.L.C.
1100 New York Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20005

mjoffre@sternekessler.com
202-772-8856
Party name: TiVo Corporation

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543