Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 19-1452
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 19-1452
Vide 19-1434, 19-1458, 19-1459
Title:Smith & Nephew, Inc., et al., Petitioners
v.
Arthrex, Inc., et al.
Docketed:July 2, 2020
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Federal Circuit
   Case Numbers:(2018-2140)
   Decision Date:October 31, 2019
   Rehearing Denied:March 23, 2020
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Jun 29 2020Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due August 3, 2020)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 20 2020Blanket Consent filed by Petitioners, Smith & Nephew, Inc., et al. VIDED
Blanket Consent
Jul 20 2020Blanket Consent filed by Respondent, Arthrex, Inc. VIDED
Blanket Consent
Jul 20 2020Blanket Consent filed by Respondent, United States VIDED
Blanket Consent
Jul 22 2020Memorandum of respondent United States filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Jul 24 2020Response to petition from respondent Arthrex, Inc. filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentOtherProof of Service
Aug 03 2020Amicus brief of Comcast Cable Communications, LLC submitted.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Mark Andrew Perry
    Counsel of Record
Gibson Dunn & Crutcher, LLP
1050 Connecticut Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20036-5306

mperry@gibsondunn.com
202-887-3667
Party name: Smith & Nephew, Inc., et al.
Attorneys for Respondents
Jeffrey Alan Lamken
    Counsel of Record
MoloLamken LLP
The Watergate, Suite 500
600 New Hampshire Ave., N.W.
Washington, DC 20037

jlamken@mololamken.com
2025562010
Party name: Arthrex, Inc.
Jeffrey B. Wall
    Counsel of Record
Acting Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: United States
Other
Donald B. Verrilli Jr.
    Counsel of Record
Munger, Tolles & Olson LLP
1155 F Streeet NW
7th Floor
Washington, DC 20004

donald.verrilli@mto.com
2022201101
Party name: Comcast Cable Communications, LLC

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543