Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 19-1451
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 19-1451
Title:Sanofi-Aventis Deutschland GmbH, Petitioner
v.
Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc.
Docketed:July 2, 2020
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Federal Circuit
   Case Numbers:(2019-1368, 2019-1369)
   Decision Date:November 19, 2019
   Rehearing Denied:January 28, 2020
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Jun 26 2020Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due August 3, 2020)
PetitionCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 28 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response from August 3, 2020 to August 24, 2020, submitted to The Clerk.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Jul 29 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including August 24, 2020.
Aug 24 2020Brief of respondent Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc. in opposition filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 08 2020Reply of petitioner Sanofi-Aventis Deutschland GmbH filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Sep 09 2020DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 9/29/2020.
Oct 05 2020Petition DENIED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Adam Baker Banks
    Counsel of Record
Weil, Gotshal & Manges LLP
767 Fifth Avenue
New York, NY 10153

adam.banks@weil.com
212 310-8000
Party name: Sanofi-Aventis Deutschland GmbH
Attorneys for Respondent
Douglas H Carsten
    Counsel of Record
Wilson Sonsini Goodrich & Rosati
12235 El Camino Real
San Diego, CA 92130

dcarsten@wsgr.com
8583502305
Party name: Mylan
Steffen Nathanael Johnson
    Counsel of Record
Wilson Sonsini Goodrich & Rosati
1700 K Street, NW, Fifth Floor
Washington, DC 20006

sjohnson@wsgr.com
(202) 973-8888
Party name: Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc.
Richard Lee Torczon Jr.Wilson Sonsini Goodrich and Rosati PC
1700 K Street, NW
Floor 5
Washington, DC 20006-3817

rtorczon@wsgr.com
202-973-8811
Party name: Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc.

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543