Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 19-1432
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 19-1432
Title:Charles Rainer Sinek, Petitioner
v.
United States
Docketed:June 29, 2020
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Second Circuit
   Case Numbers:(18-2010-cr)
   Decision Date:January 14, 2020
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Jun 12 2020Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due July 29, 2020)
PetitionProof of Service
Jul 01 2020Waiver of right of respondent United States of America to respond filed.
Main Document
Jul 08 2020DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 9/29/2020.
Oct 05 2020Petition DENIED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Vinoo P. Varghese
    Counsel of Record
Varghese & Associates, P.C.
2 Wall Street
New York, NY 10005

info@vargheselaw.com
2124306469
Party name: Charles Rainer Sinek
Attorneys for Respondent
Jeffrey B. Wall
    Counsel of Record
Acting Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: United States of America

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543