Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 19-1419
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 19-1419
Title:Michael A. Henry-Bey, Petitioner
v.
Hector Castro, et al.
Docketed:June 25, 2020
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Federal Circuit
   Case Numbers:(2020-1125)
   Decision Date:March 2, 2020
   Rehearing Denied:March 26, 2020
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
May 22 2020Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due July 27, 2020)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jun 26 2020Waiver of right of respondents Bank of New York Mellon and Nationstar Mortgage LLC to respond filed.
Main Document
Aug 12 2020DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 9/29/2020.
Oct 05 2020Petition DENIED.
Oct 27 2020Petition for Rehearing filed.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Dec 02 2020DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/8/2021.
Jan 11 2021Rehearing DENIED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Michael A. Henry-Bey931 Village Blvd.
#207
West Palm Beach, FL 33409

561-294-6819
Party name: Michael A. Henry-Bey
Attorneys for Respondents
Nancy M. Wallace
    Counsel of Record
Akerman LLP
201 E. Park Avenue
Suite 300
Tallahassee, FL 32301

nancy.wallace@akerman.com
850-224-9634
Party name: Bank of New York Mellon and Nationstar Mortgage LLC

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543