Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 19-1414
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 19-1414
Title:United States, Petitioner
v.
Joshua James Cooley
Docketed:June 24, 2020
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(17-30022)
   Decision Date:March 21, 2019
   Rehearing Denied:January 24, 2020
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Jun 19 2020Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due July 24, 2020)
PetitionProof of Service
Jul 10 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response from July 24, 2020 to August 24, 2020, submitted to The Clerk.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Jul 13 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including August 24, 2020.
Jul 24 2020Brief amici curiae of Crow Tribe of Indians, National Congress of American Indians and Other Tribal Organizations filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 24 2020Brief amici curiae of National Indigenous Women's Resource Center, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 21 2020Waiver of right of respondent Joshua James Cooley to respond filed.
Main Document
Aug 26 2020DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 9/29/2020.
Sep 15 2020Response Requested. (Due October 15, 2020)
Oct 15 2020Brief of respondent Joshua James Cooley in opposition filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 15 2020Motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed by respondent Joshua James Cooley.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Oct 22 2020Waiver of the 14-day waiting period under Rule 15.5 filed.
Main Document
Oct 28 2020DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 11/13/2020.
Oct 28 2020Reply of petitioner United States filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentProof of Service
Nov 16 2020DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 11/20/2020.
Nov 20 2020Motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed by respondent GRANTED.
Nov 20 2020Petition GRANTED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Jeffrey B. Wall
    Counsel of Record
Acting Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: United States
Attorneys for Respondent
Eric R Henkel
    Counsel of Record
Christian, Samson & Baskett, PLLC
310 W. Spruce St.
Missoula, MT 59802

eric@csblawoffice.com
406-721-7772
Party name: Joshua James Cooley
Other
Mary Kathryn Nagle
    Counsel of Record
Pipestem Law LLC
320 South Boston Ave, Suite 1705
Tulsa, OK 74103

mknagle@pipestemlaw.com
2024070591
Party name: National Indigenous Women's Resource Center
Jennifer H. Weddle
    Counsel of Record
Greenberg Traurig
1144 15th Street
Suite 3300
Denver, CO 80202

weddlej@gtlaw.com
3035726565
Party name: Crow Tribe of Indians, National Congress of American Indians and Other Tribal Organizations

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543