SEARCH TIPS
Search term too short
Invalid text in search term. Try again
ADVANCED SEARCH
DOCKET SEARCH
Search
Toggle navigation
OPINIONS
Opinions of the Court
Opinions Relating to Orders
In-Chambers Opinions
U. S. Reports
Online Sources Cited in Opinions
Media Files Cited in Opinions
Case Citation Finder
FILING & RULES
Electronic Filing
Rules and Guidance
Supreme Court Bar
ORAL ARGUMENTS
Argument Transcripts
Argument Audio
Calendars and Lists
Courtroom Seating
CASE DOCUMENTS
Docket Search
Orders of the Court
Orders by Circuit
Granted/Noted Cases List
Journal
NEWS MEDIA
Services for News Media
Press Releases
Media Advisories
Press Credentials
Speeches
A Reporter's Guide to Applications
Chief Justice's Year-End Reports on the Federal Judiciary
ABOUT THE COURT
Justices
Supreme Court at Work
History and Traditions
The Supreme Court Building
Visiting the Court
Activities for Students & Families
Building Regulations
Frequently Asked Questions
Home
>
Search Results
Docket for 19-1390
Search documents in this case:
Search
No. 19-1390
Title:
Martin Johnson, Petitioner
v.
United States
Docketed:
June 18, 2020
Lower Ct:
United States Court of Appeals for the Fourth Circuit
Case Numbers:
(18-4459, 18-4457)
Decision Date:
December 18, 2019
Rehearing Denied:
January 14, 2020
Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Date
Proceedings and Orders
Jun 12 2020
Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due July 20, 2020)
Petition
Appendix
Certificate of Word Count
Proof of Service
Jun 23 2020
Waiver of right of respondent United States to respond filed.
Main Document
Jul 01 2020
DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 9/29/2020.
Oct 05 2020
Petition DENIED.
NAME
ADDRESS
PHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Joshua Morgan Wesneski
Counsel of Record
Gibson, Dunn & Crutcher LLP
1050 Connecticut Avenue, N.W.
Washington, DC 20036
jwesneski@gibsondunn.com
(202) 8873598
Party name: Martin Johnson
Attorneys for Respondent
Jeffrey B. Wall
Counsel of Record
Acting Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001
SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: United States
{1}
##LOC[OK]##
{1}
##LOC[OK]##
##LOC[Cancel]##
{1}
##LOC[OK]##
##LOC[Cancel]##