Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 19-1388
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 19-1388
Title:Jason Small, Petitioner
v.
Memphis Light, Gas & Water
Docketed:June 18, 2020
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Sixth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(19-5710)
   Decision Date:March 12, 2020
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Jun 15 2020Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due July 20, 2020)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 10 2020Blanket Consent filed by Petitioner, Jason Small.
Blanket Consent
Jul 17 2020Brief amici curiae of Muslim Advocates and The Sikh Coalition filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 17 2020Brief amici curiae of Christian Legal Society, National Association of Evangelicals, Association of Christian Schools International, Institutional Religious Freedom Alliance, Queens Federation of Churches filed.
Main DocumentOtherCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 20 2020Brief amici curiae of Religious Liberty Scholars et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 20 2020Brief amici curiae of National Jewish Commission on Law and Public Affairs, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 05 2020DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 9/29/2020.
Aug 19 2020Response Requested. (Due September 18, 2020)
Sep 01 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response from September 18, 2020 to October 19, 2020, submitted to The Clerk.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Sep 01 2020Response to motion from petitioner Jason Small filed.
Main Document
Sep 03 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted in part; the time is extended to and including October 16, 2020.
Oct 16 2020Brief of respondent Memphis Light, Gas & Water in opposition filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Nov 03 2020Reply of petitioner Jason Small filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Nov 04 2020DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 11/20/2020.
Nov 18 2020Rescheduled.
Nov 30 2020DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 12/4/2020.
Dec 01 2020Rescheduled.
Dec 07 2020DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 12/11/2020.
Dec 09 2020Rescheduled.
Jan 04 2021DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/8/2021.
Jan 05 2021Rescheduled.
Jan 11 2021DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/15/2021.
Jan 12 2021Rescheduled.
Jan 19 2021DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/22/2021.
Jan 19 2021Rescheduled.
Feb 12 2021DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 2/19/2021.
Feb 22 2021DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 2/26/2021.
Mar 01 2021DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 3/5/2021.
Mar 15 2021DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 3/19/2021.
Mar 22 2021DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 3/26/2021.
Mar 29 2021DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 4/1/2021.
Apr 05 2021Petition DENIED. Justice Gorsuch, with whom Justice Alito joins, dissenting from the denial of certiorari. (Detached Opinion)

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Steffen Nathanael Johnson
    Counsel of Record
Wilson Sonsini Goodrich & Rosati
1700 K Street, NW, Fifth Floor
Washington, DC 20006

sjohnson@wsgr.com
(202) 973-8888
Party name: Jason Small
Attorneys for Respondent
Rodrick Darnell Holmes
    Counsel of Record
Boyle Brasher LLC
80 Monroe Avenue, Suite 410
Memphis, TN 38103

rholmes@boylebrasher.com
901-521-2860
Party name: Memphis Light, Gas & Water
Other
Kimberlee Wood Colby
    Counsel of Record
Christian Legal Society
8001 Braddock Rd., Suite 302
Springfield, VA 22151

kcolby@clsnet.org
703-894-1087
Party name: Christian Legal Society, National Association of Evangelicals, Association of Christian Schools International, Institutional Religious Freedom Alliance, Queens Federation of Churches
Harold Douglas Laycock
    Counsel of Record
University of Virginia Law School
580 Massie Road
Charlottesville, VA 48823

DLAYCOCK@VIRGINIA.EDU
512-656-1789
Party name: Religious Liberty Scholars et al.
Nathan Lewin
    Counsel of Record
Lewin & Lewin, LLP
888 17th St. NW, 4th Floor
Washington, DC 20006

nat@lewinlewin.com
2028281000
Party name: COLPA
Jeremy Brooks Rosen
    Counsel of Record
Horvitz & Levy LLP
3601 W. Olive Ave., 8th Fl.
Burbank, CA 91505

jrosen@horvitzlevy.com
818-995-0800
Party name: Muslim Advocates and The Sikh Coalition

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543