Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 19-1378
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 19-1378
Title:Phazzer Electronics, Inc., Petitioner
v.
Taser International, Inc.
Docketed:June 16, 2020
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Federal Circuit
   Case Numbers:(2018-1914)
   Decision Date:July 23, 2019
   Rehearing Denied:August 23, 2019
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Jun 08 2020Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due July 16, 2020)
PetitionCertificate of Word CountProof of ServiceAppendix
Jul 15 2020Informal Response of Taser International, Inc., not accepted for filing. (July 17, 2020)
Jul 17 2020Waiver of right of respondent Taser International, Inc. to respond filed.
Main Document
Jul 22 2020DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 9/29/2020.
Aug 05 2020Response Requested. (Due September 4, 2020)
Sep 04 2020Brief of respondent Taser International, Inc., in opposition filed.
Main DocumentOtherCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 18 2020Reply of petitioner Phazzer Electroinics, Inc. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 23 2020DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 10/9/2020.
Oct 05 2020Supplemental brief of respondent Taser International, Inc., filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 08 2020Supplemental brief of petitioner Phazzer Electroinics, Inc. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 13 2020Petition DENIED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Joseph Asher Davidow
    Counsel of Record
Willis & Davidow, LLC
9015 Strada Stell Court, Suite 106
Naples, FL 34102

jdavidow@willisdavidow.com
2394650531
Party name: Phazzer Electroinics, Inc.
Attorneys for Respondent
Pamela B. Petersen
    Counsel of Record
Axon Enterprise, Inc.
17800 N 85th Street.
Scottsdale, AZ 85255

ppetersen@axon.com
623-326-6016
Party name: Taser International, Inc.,

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543