Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 19-1351
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 19-1351
Title:Ameranth, Inc., Petitioner
v.
Domino's Pizza, LLC, et al.
Docketed:June 9, 2020
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Federal Circuit
   Case Numbers:(2019-1141, 2019-1144)
   Decision Date:November 1, 2019
   Rehearing Denied:January 6, 2020
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Jun 03 2020Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due July 9, 2020)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jun 12 2020Waiver of right of respondent Domino's Pizza, LLC, Domino's Pizza, Inc. to respond filed.
Main Document
Jun 17 2020DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 9/29/2020.
Aug 26 2020Supplemental brief of petitioner Ameranth, Inc. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 05 2020Petition DENIED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Jerrold Joseph Ganzfried
    Counsel of Record
Ganzfried Law
5335 Wisconsin Avenue, NW Suite 440
Washington, DC 20015

JJG@ganzfriedlaw.com
202-486-2004
Party name: Ameranth, Inc.
Attorneys for Respondents
Frank A. Angileri
    Counsel of Record
Brooks Kushman P.C.
1000 Town Center
22nd Floor
Southfield, MI 48075

fangileri@brookskushman.com
2483584400
Party name: Domino's Pizza, LLC, Domino's Pizza, Inc.

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543