Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 19-1333
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 19-1333
Title:Monster Energy Company, fka Hansen Beverage Company, Petitioner
v.
City Beverages LLC, dba Olympic Eagle Distributing
Docketed:June 2, 2020
Linked with 19A1014
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(17-55813, 17-56082)
   Decision Date:October 22, 2019
   Rehearing Denied:December 30, 2019
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Mar 13 2020Application (19A1014) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from March 29, 2020 to May 28, 2020, submitted to Justice Kagan.
Main Document
Mar 13 2020Application (19A1014) granted by Justice Kagan extending the time to file until May 28, 2020.
May 28 2020Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due July 2, 2020)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jun 08 2020Waiver of right of respondent City Beverages LLC, dba Olympic Eagle Distributing to respond filed.
Main Document
Jun 09 2020DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 6/25/2020.
Jun 15 2020Brief amicus curiae of JAMS, Inc. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Jun 29 2020Petition DENIED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Joseph Russell Palmore
    Counsel of Record
Morrison & Foerster LLP
2000 Pennsylvania Ave., NW
Washington, DC 20006

jpalmore@mofo.com
202-887-6940
Party name: Monster Energy Company
Attorneys for Respondent
Michael K. Vaska
    Counsel of Record
Foster Garvey PC
1111 Third Avenue
#3000
Seattle, WA 98101

mike.vaska@foster.com
206-447-8895
Party name: City Beverages LLC, dba Olympic Eagle Distributing
Other
Kelly A. Woodruff
    Counsel of Record
California Appellate Law Group LLP
96 Jessie Street
San Francisco, CA 94105

kelly.woodruff@calapplaw.com
4156496700
Party name: JAMS, Inc.

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543