Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 19-131
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 19-131
Title:Duanna Knighton, Petitioner
v.
Cedarville Rancheria of Northern Paiute Indians, et al.
Docketed:July 26, 2019
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(17-15515)
   Decision Date:April 24, 2019
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Jul 23 2019Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due August 26, 2019)
PetitionProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Aug 06 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response from August 26, 2019 to October 10, 2019, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Aug 14 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including October 10, 2019.
Oct 03 2019Brief of respondents Cedarville Rancheria of Northern Paiute Indians, et al. in opposition filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 23 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 11/8/2019.
Nov 12 2019Petition DENIED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Patrick Leslie Deedon
    Counsel of Record
Maire & Deedon
2851 Park Marina Drive, Suite 300
Redding, CA 96001

pdeedon@maire-law.com
(530) 246-6050
Party name: DUANNA KNIGHTON
Attorneys for Respondents
Jack Duran Jr.
    Counsel of Record
Duran Law Office
1100 Melody Ln
Roseville, CA 95747

duranlaw@yahoo.com
9167793316
Party name: Cedarville Rancheria of Northern Paiute Indians, et al.
Jack Duran Jr.Duran Law Office
4010 Foothills Blvd, Suite 103, No. 98
Roseville, CA 95747

916-779-3316
Party name: Cedarville Rancheria of Northern Paiute Indians, the Tribal Court and Judge Patricia Lenzi

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543