Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 19-1298
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 19-1298
Title:Rogers County Board of Tax Roll Corrections, et al., Petitioners
v.
Video Gaming Technologies, Inc.
Docketed:May 19, 2020
Linked with 19A983
Lower Ct:Supreme Court of Oklahoma
   Case Numbers:(117,491)
   Decision Date:December 17, 2019
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Mar 03 2020Application (19A983) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from March 16, 2020 to May 15, 2020, submitted to Justice Sotomayor.
Main DocumentLower Court Orders/OpinionsProof of Service
Mar 06 2020Application (19A983) granted by Justice Sotomayor extending the time to file until May 15, 2020.
May 14 2020Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due June 18, 2020)
PetitionAppendixProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Jun 01 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response from June 18, 2020 to July 20, 2020, submitted to The Clerk.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Jun 02 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including July 20, 2020.
Jun 18 2020Brief amicus curiae of Tulsa County Assessor John A. Wright filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 20 2020Brief of respondent Video Gaming Technologies, Inc. in opposition filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Aug 05 2020DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 9/29/2020.
Aug 21 2020Reply of petitioners Rogers County Board of Tax Roll Corrections, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 05 2020DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 10/9/2020.
Oct 13 2020DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 10/16/2020.
Oct 19 2020Petition DENIED. Justice Thomas, dissenting from the denial of certiorari. (Detached Opinion)

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Matthew Benjamin Free
    Counsel of Record
Best & Sharp
1 West Third Street, Suite 900
Tulsa, OK 74103

mfree@bestsharp.com
9185821234
Party name: Rogers County Board of Tax Roll Corrections, et al.
Attorneys for Respondent
Kurt Maguire Rupert
    Counsel of Record
Hartzog Conger Cason
201 Robert S. Kerr
Suite 1600
Oklahoma City, OK 73102

krupert@hartzoglaw.com
405-235-7000
Party name: Video Gaming Technologies, Inc.
Other
Leisa Sarchet Weintraub
    Counsel of Record
Tulsa County Assessor's Office
500 S. Denver, Suite 215
Tulsa, OK 74103

lweintraub@tulsacounty.org
918-596-5171
Party name: Tulsa County Assessor John A. Wright

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543