Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 19-1283
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 19-1283
Title:James Tolle, Petitioner
v.
Ralph Northam, Governor of Virginia, et al.
Docketed:May 12, 2020
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Fourth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(20-1419)
   Decision Date:April 28, 2020
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
May 01 2020Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due June 11, 2020)
PetitionAppendixProof of ServicePetitionAppendixProof of Service
May 14 2020Waiver of right of respondents Northam, Gov. of VA, et al. to respond filed.
Main Document
May 19 2020DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 6/4/2020.
May 27 2020Response Requested. (Due June 26, 2020)
Jun 03 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response from June 26, 2020 to July 27, 2020, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Jun 04 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including July 27, 2020.
Jun 24 2020Motion to expedite consideration of the petition for a writ of certiorari filed by petitioner James Tolle.
Main DocumentOtherProof of Service
Jul 06 2020Letter waiving the 14-day waiting period under Rule 15.5 filed.
Jul 16 2020Supplemental brief of petitioner James Tolle filed.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Jul 27 2020Brief of respondents Northam, Gov. of VA, et al. in opposition filed. Distributed
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 29 2020DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 9/29/2020.
Aug 08 2020Reply of petitioner James Tolle filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentProof of Service
Oct 05 2020Petition DENIED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
James Tolle11171 Soldiers Court
Manassas, VA 20109

Party name: James Tolle
Attorneys for Respondents
Toby Jay Heytens
    Counsel of Record
Office of the Attorney General
202 North Ninth Street
Richmond, VA 23219

SolicitorGeneral@oag.state.va.us
(804) 786-7240
Party name: Northam, Gov. of VA, et al.

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543