Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 19-1265
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 19-1265
Title:Friends of Danny DeVito, et al., Petitioners
v.
Tom Wolf, Governor of Pennsylvania, et al.
Docketed:May 5, 2020
Linked with 19A1032
Lower Ct:Supreme Court of Pennsylvania, Middle District
   Case Numbers:(68 MM 2020)
   Decision Date:April 13, 2020
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Apr 27 2020Application (19A1032) for a stay, submitted to Justice Alito.
Main DocumentOtherProof of Service
Apr 27 2020Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due June 4, 2020)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Apr 28 2020Response to application (19A1032) requested by Justice Alito, due Monday, May 4, by noon.
May 04 2020Response to application from respondents Tom Wolf, Governor of Pennsylvania, et al.
Main DocumentProof of Service
May 04 2020Amended Application to Stay the Enforcement of Gov. Wolf's Executive Order Dated March 19, 2020 Pending the Filing and Disposition by the US Supreme Court of Petitioners' Petition for Writ of Certiorari of Friends of Danny DeVito, et al. not accepted for filing. (May 04, 2020)
May 04 2020Supplemental brief of applicants Friends of Danny DeVito, et al. filed.
Main DocumentProof of Service
May 06 2020Reply of applicants Friends of Danny DeVito, et al. filed.
Main DocumentProof of Service
May 06 2020Application (19A1032) referred to the Court.
May 06 2020Application (19A1032) denied by the Court.
May 19 2020Brief amici curiae of County of Butler, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jun 03 2020Waiver of right of respondent Tom Wolf, Governor of Pennsylvania, et al. to respond filed.
Main Document
Jun 05 2020Supplemental Brief in Support of Petitioners' Petition for Writ of Certiorari of Friends of Danny DeVito, et al. not accepted for filing. (June 05, 2020)
Jun 05 2020Supplemental brief of petitioners Friends of Danny DeVito, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jun 09 2020DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 6/25/2020.
Jun 22 2020Response Requested. (Due July 22, 2020)
Jul 07 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response from July 22, 2020 to August 21, 2020, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Jul 09 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including August 21, 2020.
Jul 28 2020Second supplemental brief of petitioners Friends of Danny DeVito, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 21 2020Brief of respondents Tom Wolf, Governor of Pennsylvania, et al. in opposition filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Aug 31 2020Reply of petitioners Friends of Danny DeVito, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Sep 09 2020DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 9/29/2020.
Sep 22 2020Supplemental brief of petitioners Friends of Danny DeVito, et al. filed.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Oct 05 2020Petition DENIED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Marc A. Scaringi
    Counsel of Record
Scaringi & Scaringi, PC
2000 Linglestown Road
Suite 106
Harrisburg, PA 17110

marc@scaringilaw.com
7176577770
Party name: Friends of Danny DeVito, et al.
Attorneys for Respondents
John Bartley DeLone
    Counsel of Record
Attorney General's Office
Pennsylvania Office of Attorney General -Appellate Litigation Section
15th Floor, Strawberry Square
Harrisburg, PA 17120

jdelone@attorneygeneral.gov
717-783-3226
Party name: Tom Wolf, Governor of Pennsylvania, et al.
Other
Thomas W. King III
    Counsel of Record
Dillon McCandless King Coulter & Graham, LL P
128 West Cunningham Street
Butler, PA 16001

tking@dmkcg.com
7242832200
Party name: County of Butler, County of Fayette, County of Greene, and County of Washington

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543