Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 19-1261
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 19-1261
Title:Trent Michael Taylor, Petitioner
v.
Robert Riojas, et al.
Docketed:April 30, 2020
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Fifth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(17-10253)
   Decision Date:December 20, 2019
   Rehearing Denied:January 29, 2020
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Apr 24 2020Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due June 1, 2020)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
May 04 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response from June 1, 2020 to July 1, 2020, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
May 05 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including July 1, 2020.
May 14 2020Brief amici curiae of Cross-Ideological Groups Dedicated to Ensuring Official Accountability, Restoring the Public's Trust in Law Enforcement, and Promoting the Rule of Law filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jun 01 2020Brief amicus curiae of Constitutional Accountability Center filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jun 24 2020Brief of respondents Robert Riojas, et al. in opposition filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Jul 07 2020Reply of petitioner Trent Michael Taylor filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 08 2020DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 9/29/2020.
Oct 05 2020DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 10/9/2020.
Oct 05 2020Record Requested.
Oct 06 2020Record received from the U.S.C.A. for the Fifth Circuit. The record is available on PACER.
Oct 07 2020Record received from the U.S.D.C. for the Northern District of Texas. The electronic record on appeal (including sealed materials) was received.
Oct 13 2020DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 10/16/2020.
Oct 26 2020DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 10/30/2020.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Kelsi Brown Corkran
    Counsel of Record
Orrick, Herrington & Sutcliffe LLP
1152 15th Street NW
Washington, DC 20005

kcorkran@orrick.com
202-339-8497
Party name: Trent Michael Taylor
Attorneys for Respondents
Kyle Douglas Hawkins
    Counsel of Record
Texas Attorney General's Office
P.O. Box 12548 (MC 059)
Austin, TX 78711-2548

kyle.hawkins@oag.texas.gov
5129361700
Party name: Robert Riojas, et al.
Other
Brianne Jenna Gorod
    Counsel of Record
Constitutional Accountability Center
1200 18th Street, NW
Suite 501
Washington, DC 20036

brianne@theusconstitution.org
202 296 6889
Party name: Constitutional Accountability Center
Jay Remington Schweikert
    Counsel of Record
The Cato Institute
1000 Massachusetts Ave. NW
Washington, DC 20001

jschweikert@cato.org
2022161461
Party name: Cross-Ideological Groups Dedicated to Ensuring Official Accountability, Restoring the Public's Trust in Law Enforcement, and Promoting the Rule of Law

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543