Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 19-1252
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 19-1252
Title:Callan Campbell, et al., Petitioners
v.
United States
Docketed:April 28, 2020
Linked with 19A890
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Federal Circuit
   Case Numbers:(2018-2014)
   Decision Date:August 1, 2019
   Rehearing Denied:November 22, 2019
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Feb 07 2020Application (19A890) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from February 20, 2020 to April 20, 2020, submitted to The Chief Justice.
Main DocumentLower Court Orders/OpinionsLower Court Orders/OpinionsProof of Service
Feb 10 2020Application (19A890) granted by The Chief Justice extending the time to file until April 20, 2020.
Apr 20 2020Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due May 28, 2020)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
May 14 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response from May 28, 2020 to June 29, 2020, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
May 15 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including June 29, 2020.
May 29 2020Amicus brief of Center for Auto Safety not accepted for filing. (June 05, 2020)(Corrected version submitted)
May 29 2020Motion for leave to file amicus brief filed by Center for Auto Safety. (6/8/2020)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jun 24 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response from June 29, 2020 to July 29, 2020, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Jun 26 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including July 29, 2020.
Jul 29 2020Brief of respondent United States in opposition filed.
Proof of ServiceMain Document
Aug 10 2020Motion of petitioner to delay distribution of the petition for a writ of certiorari under Rule 15.5 from August 12, 2020 to August 26, 2020, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Aug 11 2020Motion to delay distribution of the petition for a writ certiorari until August 26, 2020, granted.
Aug 25 2020Reply of petitioners Callan Campbell, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 26 2020DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 9/29/2020.
Oct 05 2020Motion for leave to file amicus brief filed by Center for Auto Safety GRANTED.
Oct 05 2020Petition DENIED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Robert H. Thomas
    Counsel of Record
Damon Key Leong Kupchak Hastert
1003 Bishop Street
1600 Pauahi Tower
Honolulu, HI 96813-0000

rht@hawaiilawyer.com
808-531-8031
Party name: Callan Campbell, et al.
Attorneys for Respondent
Jeffrey B. Wall
    Counsel of Record
Acting Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: United States
Other
William Thomas DeVinney
    Counsel of Record
Baker Hostetler LLP
1050 Connecticut Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20036

bill.devinney@gmail.com
2028611554
Party name: Center for Auto Safety

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543