Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 19-123
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 19-123
Title:Sharonell Fulton, et al., Petitioners
v.
City of Philadelphia, Pennsylvania, et al.
Docketed:July 25, 2019
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Third Circuit
   Case Numbers:(18-2574)
   Decision Date:April 22, 2019
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Jul 22 2019Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due August 26, 2019)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 07 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response from August 26, 2019 to October 25, 2019, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Aug 07 2019Brief amici curiae of Former Foster Children and Foster Parents and the Catholic Association Foundation filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 13 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted in part; the time is extended to and including October 10, 2019.
Aug 16 2019Brief amicus curiae of Jewish Coalition for Religious Liberty filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 26 2019Brief amici curiae of The States of Texas, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 26 2019Brief amici curiae of 44 United States Senators and Members of the House of Representatives filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 26 2019Brief amicus curiae of Center for Constitutional Jurisprudence filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 26 2019Brief amicus curiae of Foundation for Moral Law filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 10 2019Brief of respondents Support Center for Child Advocates and Philadelphia Family Pride in opposition filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 10 2019Brief of respondents City of Philadelphia, et al. in opposition filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 28 2019Reply of petitioners Sharonell Fulton, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 30 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 11/15/2019.
Nov 12 2019Rescheduled.
Nov 20 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 12/6/2019.
Dec 03 2019Rescheduled.
Dec 09 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 12/13/2019.
Dec 11 2019Rescheduled.
Jan 06 2020DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/10/2020.
Jan 13 2020DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/17/2020.
Jan 21 2020DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/24/2020.
Feb 14 2020DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 2/21/2020.
Feb 24 2020Petition GRANTED.
Mar 17 2020Motion for an extension of time to file the briefs on the merits filed.
Main Document
Mar 23 2020Motion to extend the time to file the briefs on the merits granted. The time to file the joint appendix and petitioners' brief on the merits is extended to and including May 27, 2020. The time to file respondents' briefs on the merits is extended to and including August 13, 2020.
May 07 2020Blanket Consent filed by Respondents, City of Philadelphia, Department of Human Services for the City of Philadelphia, Philadelphia Commission on Human Relations.
Blanket Consent
May 27 2020Joint appendix (two volumes) filed.
Main DocumentMain Document
May 27 2020Brief of petitioners Sharonell Fulton, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
May 27 2020Brief amicus curiae of Jewish Coalition for Religious Liberty filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
May 28 2020Brief amici curiae of The Institute for Faith and Family, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jun 01 2020Brief amicus curiae of National Association of Evangelicals filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jun 01 2020Amicus brief of Foundation for Moral Law not accepted for filing. (June 09, 2020 - Duplicate submission.)
Jun 01 2020Brief amicus curiae of Foundation for Moral Law filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jun 02 2020Brief amicus curiae of Center for Constitutional Jurisprudence filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jun 02 2020Brief amici curiae of The Bruderhof, United Sikhs, The International Society for Krishna Consciousness (ISKCON), The Islam & Religious Freedom Action Team of the Religious Freedom Institute, and Asma Uddin filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jun 02 2020Brief amici curiae of States of Nebraska, Arizona, and Ohio filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jun 02 2020Brief amicus curiae of Eugene Volokh in support of neither party filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jun 03 2020Brief amicus curiae of United States filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word Count
Jun 03 2020Brief amicus curiae of Robertson Center for Constitutional Law filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jun 03 2020Brief amici curiae of Concerned Women for America, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jun 03 2020Brief amici curiae of Life Legal Defense Foundation et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jun 03 2020Brief amici curiae of Archbishop Jerome E. Listecki and the Roman Catholic Archdiocese of Milwaukee filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jun 03 2020Brief amici curiae of James and Gail Blais, General Conference of Seventh-day Adventists filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jun 03 2020Brief amici curiae of United States Conference of Catholic Bishops, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jun 03 2020Brief amici curiae of New Hope Family Services, Inc. and Catholic Charities West Michigan filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jun 03 2020Brief amicus curiae of Americans for Prosperity Foundation filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jun 03 2020Brief amici curiae of Current and Former State Legislators filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Jun 03 2020Brief amicus curiae of Generation Justice filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jun 03 2020Brief amici curiae of The Church of Jesus Christ of Latter-day Saints, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jun 03 2020Brief amici curiae of Catholic Charities of the Diocese of Springfield, Illinois, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jun 03 2020Brief amicus curiae of Former Attorney General Edwin Meese III filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jun 03 2020Brief amici curiae of The States of Texas, Alabama, Arkansa, Llouisiana, Missouri, Nebraska, Ohio, Oklahoma, West Virginia and Commonwealth of Kentucky filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jun 03 2020Brief amicus curiae of Galen Black filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jun 03 2020Brief amici curiae of 76 United States Senators and Members of the House of Representatives filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jun 03 2020Brief amici curiae of Coalition for Jewish Values, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jun 03 2020Brief amici curiae of Dorothy Frame, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jun 03 2020Brief amici curiae of National Jewish Commission on Law and Public Affairs, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jun 03 2020Brief amici curiae of Former Foster Children and Foster Parents, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jun 03 2020Brief amici curiae of Christian Legal Society et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jun 03 2020Brief amicus curiae of Great Lakes Justice Center filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jun 03 2020Brief amici curiae of Fifteen Pennsylvania State Senators filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jun 03 2020Brief amici curiae of Council for Christian Colleges and Universities, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jun 03 2020Brief amicus curiae of New Civil Liberties Alliance filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jun 03 2020Brief amicus curiae of The Rutherford Institute filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Aug 13 2020Brief of city respondents City of Philadelphia, Department of Human Services for the City of Philadelphia, Philadelphia Commission on Human Relations filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 13 2020Appendix to city respondents brief on the merits filed (to be recovered - August 20, 2020).
Aug 13 2020Supplemental Appendix to City Respondents' Brief on the Merits filed (8/21/2020).
Main DocumentProof of Service
Aug 13 2020Brief of intervenor-respondents Support Center for Child Advocates and Philadelphia Family Pride filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 14 2020Brief amici curiae of Amici Curiae 27 Roman Catholic Lay Persons Supporting Respondents filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 14 2020Motion of the Acting Solicitor General for leave to participate in oral argument as amicus curiae and for divided argument filed.
Proof of ServiceMain Document
Aug 18 2020Brief amici curiae of Legal Scholars in Support of Equality in Support of Respondents filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Aug 19 2020SET FOR ARGUMENT on Wednesday, November 4, 2020.
Aug 19 2020Brief amici curiae of Scholars of the Constitutional Rights and Interests of Children filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 19 2020Brief amici curiae of Alan Brownstein, Melissa Rogers, and Rabbi David Saperstein filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 19 2020Brief amici curiae of Center for the Study of Social Policy and National Center for Lesbian Rights filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 19 2020Brief amici curiae of Amici Miguel Diaz, CHILD USA, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 19 2020Joint motion for divided argument filed by respondents.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Aug 19 2020Brief amicus curiae of Government Contracts Professor and Practitioner Richard C. Loeb filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 20 2020Brief amicus curiae of Lawrence G. Sager filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 20 2020Brief amicus curiae of American Atheists, Inc. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 20 2020Brief amici curiae of GLBTQ Legal Advocates & Defenders and 27 Other LGBTQ Advocacy Groups filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 20 2020Brief amici curiae of Services and Advocacy for GLBT Elders (SAGE) and 25 Other Organizations Serving Older and Disabled Individuals filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 20 2020Brief amici curiae of Republican Legislators, Elected Officials, and Leaders filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 20 2020Brief amicus curiae of The American Bar Association filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 20 2020Brief amici curiae of The Annie E. Casey Foundation, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 20 2020Brief amici curiae of Voice for Adoption, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 20 2020Brief amici curiae of Local Governments, Mayors, and U.S. Conference of Mayors as Amici Curiae in Support of Respondents filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 20 2020Brief amici curiae of First Amendment Scholars filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 20 2020Brief amici curiae of Lee C. Bollinger, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 20 2020Brief amici curiae of Church-State Scholars filed.
Main DocumentOtherCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 20 2020Brief amici curiae of Organizations Serving LGBTQ Youth filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 20 2020Brief amici curiae of Indian Law Professors filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 20 2020Brief amici curiae of Former Service Secretaries and the Modern Military Association of America filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 20 2020Brief amici curiae of Scholars Who Study The LGB Population filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 20 2020Brief amici curiae of American Psychological Association, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 20 2020Brief amici curiae of The Leadership Conference on Civil and Human Rights, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 20 2020Brief amici curiae of Prospective Foster Parents Subjected to Religiously Motivated Discrimination by Child-Placement Agencies filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 20 2020Brief amici curiae of Baptist Joint Committee For Religious Liberty, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 20 2020Brief amicus curiae of Commonwealth of Pennsylvania filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 20 2020Brief amici curiae of Freedom From Religion Foundation, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 20 2020Brief amici curiae of Professors Ira C. Lupu, et al. filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Aug 20 2020Brief amici curiae of Family Equality and PFLAG National filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 20 2020Brief amicus curiae of New York State Bar Association filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 20 2020Brief amicus curiae of KidsVoice filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 20 2020Brief amici curiae of Members of Congress filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 20 2020Brief amicus curiae of Lutheran Child and Family Services of Illinois filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 20 2020Brief amicus curiae of Office of the Cook County Public Guardian filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Aug 20 2020Brief amici curiae of Historians of Child Welfare filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 20 2020Brief amici curiae of 32 Businesses and Organizations filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 20 2020Brief amici curiae of President of the House of Deputies of The Episcopal Church, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 20 2020Brief amici curiae of ADL (Anti-Defamation League) and Other Organizations filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 20 2020Brief amici curiae of FosterClub and Former Foster Youth filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 20 2020Brief amici curiae of Children's Rights, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 20 2020Brief amici curiae of Massachusetts, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 20 2020Amicus brief of The National Women's Law Center and 35 Additional Organizations not accepted for filing. (August 26, 2020 - Corrected version submitted).
Aug 20 2020Brief amici curiae of The National Women's Law Center and 35 Additional Organizations filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 20 2020Brief amici curiae of National LGBT Bar Assocation, et al. filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Aug 20 2020Brief amici curiae of The National League of Cities et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 31 2020Record requested from the U.S.C.A. 3rd Circuit.
Sep 02 2020CIRCULATED
Sep 14 2020Reply of petitioners Sharonell Fulton, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Lori Halstead Windham
    Counsel of Record
The Becket Fund for Religious Liberty
1200 New Hampshire Ave., NW
Suite 700
Washington, DC 20036

lwindham@becketlaw.org
202-349-7202
Party name: Sharonell Fulton, et al.
Mark Leonard RienziThe Becket Fund for Religious Liberty
1200 New Hampshire Ave., NW
Suite 700
Washington, DC 20036

mrienzi@becketlaw.org
(202) 955-0095
Party name: Sharonell Fulton, et al.
Attorneys for Respondents
Leslie Cooper
    Counsel of Record
American Civil Liberties Union
125 Broad Street
New York, NY 10004

lcooper@aclu.org
2125197815
Party name: Intervenor Support Center for Child Advocates and Philadelphia Family Pride
Neal Kumar Katyal
    Counsel of Record
Hogan Lovells US LLP
555 Thirteenth St., N.W.
Washington, DC 20004

neal.katyal@hoganlovells.com
202 637 5528
Party name: City of Philadelphia, Department of Human Services for the City of Philadelphia, Philadelphia Commission on Human Relations
Deepak GuptaGupta Wessler PLLC
1900 L Street, NW
Suite 312
Washington, DC 20036

deepak@guptawessler.com
(202) 888-1741
Party name: City of Philadelphia, Department of Human Services for the City of Philadelphia, Philadelphia Commission on Human Relations
Other
Jessica Ring Amunson
    Counsel of Record
Jenner & Block LLP
1099 New York Avenue NW
Suite 900
Washington, DC 20001

JAmunson@jenner.com
202-639-6023
Party name: American Psychological Association, American Academy of Pediatrics, American Medical Association, American Psychiatric Association
Todd Steven Anten
    Counsel of Record
Quinn Emanuel Urquhart & Sullivan, LLP
51 Madison Avenue
New York, NY 10010

toddanten@quinnemanuel.com
(212) 849-7000
Party name: The Leadership Conference on Civil and Human Rights, Lawyers’ Committee for Civil Rights Under Law, and 28 Other Organizations
Peter T. Barbur
    Counsel of Record
Cravath, Swaine & Moore
825 Eighth Avenue
New York, NY 10019

pbarbur@cravath.com
(212) 474-1000
Party name: Members of Congress
Timothy Belz
    Counsel of Record
Ottsen, Leggat & Belz, L.C.
112 South Hanley, Suite 200
St. Louis, MO 63105

tbelz@olblaw.com
3147262800
Party name: National Association of Evangelicals
Michael Evan Bern
    Counsel of Record
Latham & Watkins, LLP
555 11th Street NW, Suite 1000
Washington, DC 20004-1304

michael.bern@lw.com
202-637-1021
Party name: Ray Mabus, Deborah Lee James, Eric Fanning and the Modern Military Association of America
Geoffrey Thomas Blackwell
    Counsel of Record
American Atheists, Inc.
1100 15th St. NW
4th Floor
Washington, DC 20005

legal@atheists.org
(908) 276-7300
Party name: American Atheists, Inc.
Carmine D. Boccuzzi Jr.
    Counsel of Record
Cleary, Gottlieb, Steen, et al
One Liberty Plaza
New York, NY 10006

cboccuzzi@cgsh.com
212-225-2508
Party name: Alan Brownstein, Melissa Rogers, and Rabbi David Saperstein
Mary L. Bonauto
    Counsel of Record
GLBTQ Legal Advocates & Defenders
18 Tremont Street, Suite 950
Boston, MA 02108

mbonauto@glad.org
617-426-1350
Party name: GLBTQ Legal Advocates & Defenders and 27 Other LGBTQ Advocacy Groups
Bruce N. Cameron
    Counsel of Record
National Right to Work Legal Defense Foundation, Inc.
8001 Braddock Road, Ste. 600
Springfield, VA 22160

bnc@nrtw.org
703-321-8510
Party name: Dorothy Frame, Annlee Post, & National Right to Work Legal Defense Foundation
James A. Campbell
    Counsel of Record
Nebraska Attorney General's Office
2115 State Capitol
Lincoln, NE 68509

jim.campbell@nebraska.gov
402-471-2682
Party name: States of Nebraska, Arizona, and Ohio
Frederick W. Claybrook Jr.
    Counsel of Record
Claybrook, LLC
700 Sixth St., NW, Ste.430
Washington, DC 20001

rick@claybrooklaw.com
202-250-3883
Party name: Concerned Women for America, et al.
Miles Edward Coleman
    Counsel of Record
Nelson Mullins Riley & Scarborough, LLP
2 West Washington Street
Suite 400
Greenville, SC 29601

miles.coleman@nelsonmullins.com
864-373-2352
Party name: United States Senators and Members of the House of Representatives
Cynthia Fleming Crawford
    Counsel of Record
Americans for Prosperity Foundation
1310 N. Courthouse Road
7th Floor
Arlington, VA 22201

cynthia.crawford@causeofaction.org
5713292227
Party name: Americans for Prosperity Foundation
Richard Paul Dearing
    Counsel of Record
New York City Law Department
100 Church Street
New York, NY 10271

rdearing@law.nyc.gov
2123562500
Party name: Local Governments, Mayors, and U.S. Conference of Mayors as Amici Curiae in Support of Respondents
Elizabeth Napier Dewar
    Counsel of Record
One Ashburton Place
Boston, MA 02108

bessie.dewar@mass.gov
617-963-2204
Party name: Massachusetts, et al.
Deborah Dewart
    Counsel of Record
620 E. Sabiston Drive
Swansboro, NC 28584

debcpalaw@earthlink.net
9103264554
Party name: The Institute for Faith and Family and The International Conference of Evangelical Chaplain Endorsers
Alexander Dushku
    Counsel of Record
Kirton McConkie
36 South State Street
Suite 1900
Salt Lake City, UT 84111

adushku@kmclaw.com
801 328 3600
Party name: The Church of Jesus Christ of Latter-day Saints, et al.
John Allen Eidsmoe
    Counsel of Record
Foundation for Moral Law
One Dexter Avenue
Montgomery, AL 36104

eidsmoeja@juno.com
3342621245
Party name: Foundation for Moral Law
Clifton S. Elgarten
    Counsel of Record
Crowell & Moring LLP
1001 Pennsylvania Ave., N.W.
Washington, DC 20004

celgarten@crowell.com
2026242500
Party name: The Annie E. Casey Foundation, The Raikes Foundation, The Conrad N. Hilton Foundation, and the Redlich Horwitz Foundation
Patrick C Elliott
    Counsel of Record
Freedom From Religion Foundation
PO BOX 750
Madison, WI 53701

pelliott@ffrf.org
6082568900
Party name: Freedom From Religion Foundation, et al.
Richard Michael Esenberg
    Counsel of Record
Wisconsin Institute for Law & Liberty
330 E. Kilbourn
Suite 725
Milwaukee, WI 53202

rick@will-law.org
414-727-9455
Party name: Archbishop Jerome E. Listecki and the Roman Catholic Archdiocese of Milwaukee
David R. Fine
    Counsel of Record
K & L Gates LLP
17 North Second Street
18th Floor
Harrisburg, PA 17101

david.fine@klgates.com
(717) 231-4500
Party name: KidsVoice
Michael J. Fischer
    Counsel of Record
Pennsylvania Office of Attorney General
1600 Arch St.
Suite 300
Philadelphia, PA 19103

mfischer@attorneygeneral.gov
215-560-2171
Party name: Commonwealth of Pennsylvania
David Scott Flugman
    Counsel of Record
Selendy & Gay PLLC
1290 Avenue of the Americas
New York, NY 10104

dflugman@selendygay.com
212-390-9000
Party name: Professors Ira C. Lupu, Frederick Mark Gedicks, William P. Marshall, and Robert W. Tuttle
Charles P. Golbert
    Counsel of Record
Office of the Cook County Public Guardian
2245 West Ogden Avenue
Fourth Floor
Chicago, IL 60612

charles.golbert@cookcountyil.gov
3124334300
Party name: Office of the Cook County Public Guardian
Brianne Jenna Gorod
    Counsel of Record
Constitutional Accountability Center
1200 18th Street, NW
Suite 501
Washington, DC 20036

brianne@theusconstitution.org
202 296 6889
Party name: First Amendment Scholars
Leslie Carol Griffin
    Counsel of Record
University of Nevada, Las Vegas William S. Boyd School of Law
4505 S. Maryland Parkway
Box 451003
Las Vegas, NV 89154-1003

leslie.griffin@unlv.edu
7133013105
Party name: Amici Miguel Diaz, CHILD USA, et al.
Alan Gura
    Counsel of Record
Gura PLLC
916 Prince Street
Suite 107
Alexandria, VA 22314

alan@gurapllc.com
7038359085
Party name: Generation Justice
Kendyl Taylor Hanks
    Counsel of Record
Greenberg Traurig, LLP
300 West 6th Street
Suite 2050
Austin, TX 78701

hanksk@gtlaw.com
5123207200
Party name: Children's Rights, et al.
Scott Michael Karson
    Counsel of Record
New York State Bar Association
One Elk Street
Albany, NY 12207

smk@lambbarnosky.com
5184633200
Party name: New York State Bar Association
Richard Brian Katskee
    Counsel of Record
Americans United for Separation of Church and State
1310 L Street, NW, Suite 200
Washington, DC 20005

katskee@au.org
202-466-3234
Party name: Prospective Foster Parents Subjected to Religiously Motivated Discrimination by Child-Placement Agencies
Katherine Keating
    Counsel of Record
Bryan Cave Leighton Paisner LLP
3 Embarcadero Center, 7th Floor
San Francisco, CA 94111

katherine.keating@bclplaw.com
415-268-1972
Party name: Family Equality and PFLAG National
James Wayne Kim
    Counsel of Record
McDermott Will & Emery LLP
500 North Capitol Street, NW
Washington, DC 20001

jakim@mwe.com
2027568386
Party name: Republican Legislators, Elected Officials, and Leaders
Eric Nieuwenhuis Kniffin
    Counsel of Record
Lewis Roca Rothgerber Christie LLP
90 South Cascade Avenue, Suite 1100
Colorado Springs, CO 80903

ekniffin@lrrc.com
7193863017
Party name: United States Conference of Catholic Bishops and Pennsylvania Catholic Conference
John J. Korzen
    Counsel of Record
Wake Forest University School of Law Appellate Advocacy Clinic
PO Box 7206
Winston-Salem, NC 27109

korzenjj@wfu.edu
3367585832
Party name: The National League of Cities et al.
Lauren Suzanne Kuley
    Counsel of Record
Squire Patton Boggs (US) LLP
201 E. Fourth St. Suite 1900
Cincinnati, OH 45202

lauren.kuley@squirepb.com
5133611241
Party name: Service and Advocacy for GLBT Elders (SAGE) and 25 Other Organizations Serving Older and Disabled Individuals
Harold Douglas Laycock
    Counsel of Record
University of Virginia Law School
580 Massie Road
Charlottesville, VA 22903

DLAYCOCK@VIRGINIA.EDU
512-656-1789
Party name: Christian Legal Society et al.
Nathan Lewin
    Counsel of Record
Lewin & Lewin, LLP
888 17th St. NW, 4th Floor
Washington, DC 20006

nat@lewinlewin.com
2028281000
Party name: National Jewish Commission on Law and Public Affairs
Michael J. Lockerby
    Counsel of Record
Foley & Lardner LLP
3000 K Street, N.W., Suite 600
Washington Harbour
Washington, DC 20007

mlockerby@foley.com
202-945-6079
Party name: The Rutherford Institute
Jesse Ryan Loffler
    Counsel of Record
Cozen O'Connor
45 Broadway, 23rd Floor
New York, NY 10006

jloffler@cozen.com
2124533926
Party name: FosterClub and Former Foster Youth
Christopher C. Lund
    Counsel of Record
Wayne State University Law School
471 W. Palmer St.
Detroit, MI 48202

lund@wayne.edu
2022771264
Party name: The Bruderhof, United Sikhs, The International Society for Krishna Consciousness (ISKCON), The Islam & Religious Freedom Action Team of the Religious Freedom Institute, and Asma Uddin
Jonathan L. Marcus
    Counsel of Record
1440 New York Ave., NW
Washington, DC 20005

jonathan.marcus@probonolaw.com
202-371-7000
Party name: Lee C. Bollinger, Erwin Chemerinksy, Burt Neuborne, Robert C. Post and Geoffrey Stone
Mark D. Martin
    Counsel of Record
Robertson Center for Constitutional Law
1000 Regent University Drive
Virginia Beach, VA 23464

mmartin@regent.edu
757-352-4040
Party name: Robertson Center for Constitutional Law
Judy Perry Martinez
    Counsel of Record
American Bar Association
321 N. Clark Street
Chicago, IL 60654

AmicusBriefs@americanbar.org
312-988-5000
Party name: The American Bar Association
Todd R. McFarland
    Counsel of Record
General Conference of Seventh-day Adventist Church
Office of General Counsel
12501 Old Columbia Pike
Silver Spring, MD 20904-6600

mcfarlandt@gc.adventist.org
3016806321
Party name: James and Gail Blais, General Conference of Seventh-day Adventists
Thomas Gerald Olp
    Counsel of Record
A National Public Interest Law Firm
Thomas More Society
309 W. Washington, Suite 1250
Chicago, IL 60606

tomolp@gmail.com
3127821680
Party name: Catholic Charities Of Springfield, Illinois, And Catholic Charities Of Joliet, Inc.,
Patricia Bernadette Palacios
    Counsel of Record
Steptoe & Johnson LLP
1330 Connecticut Ave. NW
Washington, DC 20036

ppalacios@steptoe.com
202429-3000
Party name: 32 Businesses and Organizations
Joseph Russell Palmore
    Counsel of Record
Morrison & Foerster LLP
2000 Pennsylvania Ave., NW
Washington, DC 20006

jpalmore@mofo.com
202-887-6940
Party name: Lutheran Child and Family Services of Illinois
Jennifer C. Pizer
    Counsel of Record
Lambda Legal Defense and Education Fund, Inc.
4221 Wilshire Blvd., Suite 280
Los Angeles, CA 90010

jpizer@lambdalegal.org
2135905903
Party name: Organizations Serving LGBTQ Youth
James K. Riley
    Counsel of Record
145 Franklin Avenue
Pearl River, NY 10965

jrjrprny@gmail.com
845-653-1722
Party name: Amici Curiae 27 Roman Catholic Lay Persons Supporting Respondents
Cynthia Cook Robertson
    Counsel of Record
Pillsbury Winthrop Shaw Pittman LLP
1200 Seventeenth Street, N.W.
Washington, DC 20036

cynthia.robertson@pillsburylaw.com
202-663-9256
Party name: Government Contracts Professor and Practitioner Richard C. Loeb
Kara McKenna Rollins
    Counsel of Record
New Civil Liberties Alliance
1225 19th St. NW, Ste. 450
Washington, DC 20036

kara.rollins@ncla.onmicrosoft.com
(202) 908-6203
Party name: New Civil Liberties Alliance
Sanford Jay Rosen
    Counsel of Record
Rosen Bien Galvan & Grunfeld LLP
101 Mission Street, 6th Floor
San Francisco, CA 94105

srosen@rbgg.com
415-433-6830
Party name: National LGBT Bar Assocation, et al.
Jerome C. Roth
    Counsel of Record
Munger, Tolles & Olson LLP
560 Mission Street
27th Floor
San Francisco, CA 94105

Jerome.Roth@mto.com
4155124010
Party name: Indian Law Professors
Charles Rothfeld
    Counsel of Record
Mayer Brown LLP
1999 K Street NW
Washington, DC 20006

crothfeld@mayerbrown.com
202-263-3000
Party name: Lawrence G. Sager
Gene Clayton Schaerr
    Counsel of Record
Schaerr | Jaffe
1717 K Street NW, Suite 900
Washington, DC 20006

gschaerr@schaerr-jaffe.com
202-787-1060
Party name: Council for Christian Colleges and Universities, The Association for Biblical Higher Education, and Thirty-One Individual Religious Colleges and Universities
Christopher Paul Schandevel
    Counsel of Record
Alliance Defending Freedom
20116 Ashbrook Place
Suite 250
Ashburn, VA 20147

cschandevel@ADFlegal.org
5717074655
Party name: New Hope Family Services, Inc. and Catholic Charities West Michigan
Gilbert Ross Serota
    Counsel of Record
Arnold and Porter
3 Embarcadero Center
10th Floor
San Francisco, CA 94111

gilbert.serota@arnoldporter.com
4154713170
Party name: ADL (Anti-Defamation League) and Other Organizations as Amici Curiae In Support of Respondents
Chanakya Arjun Sethi
    Counsel of Record
Wilkinson Walsh LLP
130 W 42nd St
24th Floor
New York, NY 10036

csethi@wilkinsonwalsh.com
929-264-7758
Party name: Historians of Child Welfare
Kelly J. Shackelford
    Counsel of Record
First Liberty Institute
First Liberty Institute, 2001 W Piano Pkwy
Suite 1600
Plano, TX 75075

kshackelford@firstliberty.org
972-941-4444
Party name: Galen Black
Rachel Gabriella Shalev
    Counsel of Record
Orrick, Herrington & Sutcliffe LLP
51 West 52nd Street
New York, NY 10019

rshalev@orrick.com
2125065000
Party name: Church-State Scholars
Catherine Wynne Short
    Counsel of Record
Life Legal Defense Foundation
P.O. Box 2105
Napa, CA 94558

kshort@lldf.org
(707) 224-6675
Party name: Life Legal Defense Foundation et al.
Howard Nathan Slugh
    Counsel of Record
2400 Virginia Ave NW
APT C619
WASHINGTON, DC 20037

hslugh@jcrl.org
9543289461
Party name: Jewish Coalition for Religious Liberty
Catherine E. Smith
    Counsel of Record
2255 E. Evans Ave.
Denver, CO 80208

csmith@law.du.edu
8327521458
Party name: Scholars of the Constitutional Rights and Interests of Children
Jeffrey S. Trachtman
    Counsel of Record
Kramer Levin Naftalis & Frankel LLP
1177 Avenue of the Americas
New York, NY 10036

jtrachtman@kramerlevin.com
212 715 9175
Party name: The Rev. Gay Clark Jennings, President of the House of Deputies of The Episcopal Church; Rabbinical Assembly; United Synagogue of Conservative Judaism, et.al.
Carson J. Tucker
    Counsel of Record
Lex Fori PLLC
117 N FIRST ST.
Suite 111
Ann Arbor, MI 48104

cjtucker@lexfori.org
7348879261
Party name: Current and Former State Legislators
James Edward Tysse
    Counsel of Record
Akin Gump Strauss Hauer & Feld LLP
2001 K Street N.W.
Washington, DC 20006

jtysse@akingump.com
202-887-4571
Party name: Scholars Who Study The LGB Population
Kyle Courtenay Velte
    Counsel of Record
University of Kansas School of Law
1535 W. 15th Street
Lawrence, KS 66045

kvelte@ku.edu
7206489266
Party name: Legal Scholars in Support of Equality in Support of Respondents
Eugene Volokh
    Counsel of Record
UCLA School of Law
405 Hilgard Ave.
Los Angeles, CA 90095

volokh@law.ucla.edu
310-206-3926
Party name: Eugene Volokh
William Wagner
    Counsel of Record
Great Lakes Justice Center
5600 W. Mount Hope Hwy.
Upper Level
Lansing, MI 48917

AttyContact@GreatLakesJC.org
517-322-3207
Party name: Great Lakes Justice Center
Jeffrey B. Wall
    Counsel of Record
Acting Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: United States
Edward Mark Wenger
    Counsel of Record
119 South Monroe Street
Suite 300
Tallahassee, FL 32301

edw@hgslaw.com
850-425-2352
Party name: Former Attorney General Edwin Meese III
Randall L. Wenger
    Counsel of Record
Independence Law Center
23 N. Front Street, First Floor
Harrisburg, PA 17101

rwenger@indlawcenter.org
717-657-4990
Party name: Fifteen Pennsylvania State Senators
Julie H. Wilensky
    Counsel of Record
National Center for Lesbian Rights
870 Market Street, Suite 370
San Francisco, CA 94602

jwilensky@nclrights.org
415-343-7676
Party name: Center for the Study of Social Policy and National Center for Lesbian Rights
Philip Daniel Williamson
    Counsel of Record
Taft Stettinius & Hollister LLP
425 Walnut Street, Suite 1800
Cincinnati, OH 45202

pwilliamson@taftlaw.com
5133579417
Party name: Coalition for Jewish Values, The Call, Lifeline Children’s Services, FaithBridge Foster Care, Prof. Elizabeth Kirk, and Prof. David Smolin
Evan Wolfson
    Counsel of Record
Dentons
1221 Avenue of the Americas
25th Floor
New York, NY 10020

evan.wolfson@dentons.com
212-768-6700
Party name: The National Women's Law Center and 35 Additional Organizations
Paul Reinherz Quitman Wolfson
    Counsel of Record
Wilmer Cutler Pickering Hale and Dorr, LLP
1875 Pennsylvania Ave., NW
Washington, DC 20006

paul.wolfson@wilmerhale.com
2026636390
Party name: North American Council on Adoptable Children, National Association of Social Workers, Child Welfare League of America, and American Professional Society on the Abuse of Children
David Meir Zionts
    Counsel of Record
Covington & Burlington LLP
850 Tenth Street, NW
Washington, DC 20001

dzionts@cov.com
2026626000
Party name: Baptist Joint Committee For Religious Liberty, The Presiding Bishop Of The Episcopal Church, General Synod Of The United Church Of Christ, and The Evangelical Lutheran Church
Anthony Thomas CasoCenter for Constitutional Jurisprudence
One University Drive
Orange, CA 92866

caso@chapman.edu
877-855-3330
Party name: Center for Constitutional Jurisprudence
Kyle Douglas Hawkins
    Counsel of Record
Texas Attorney General's Office
P.O. Box 12548 (MC 059)
Austin, TX 78711-2548

kyle.hawkins@oag.texas.gov
5129361700
Party name: The States of Texas, Alabama, Arkansa, Llouisiana, Missouri, Nebraska, Ohio, Oklahoma, West Virginia and Commonwealth of Kentucky
Andrea Marie Picciotti-Bayer
    Counsel of Record
Catholic Association Foundation
3220 N. Street NW, Suite 126
Washington, DC 20007

amariepicciotti@gmail.com
5712016564
Party name: Former Foster Children and Foster Parents and the Catholic Association Foundation

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543