Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 19-1225
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 19-1225
Title:Paul Hunt, Petitioner
v.
Board of Regents of the University of New Mexico, et al.
Docketed:April 17, 2020
Linked with 19A860
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(18-2149)
   Decision Date:November 14, 2019
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Jan 30 2020Application (19A860) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from February 12, 2020 to April 10, 2020, submitted to Justice Sotomayor.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Jan 31 2020Application (19A860) granted by Justice Sotomayor extending the time to file until April 10, 2020.
Apr 10 2020Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due May 18, 2020)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Apr 21 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response from May 18, 2020 to May 29, 2020, submitted to The Clerk.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Apr 22 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including May 29, 2020.
May 11 2020Motion for leave to file amicus brief filed by Southeastern Legal Foundation.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
May 18 2020Motion for leave to file amicus brief filed by Speech First.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
May 18 2020Motion for leave to file amici brief filed by First Amendment Scholars.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
May 18 2020Motion for leave to file amici brief filed by Joseph L.Brechner Center for Freedom of Information, et al.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
May 28 2020Brief of respondents Board of Regents of the University of New Mexico, et al. in opposition filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jun 17 2020DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 9/29/2020.
Jun 18 2020Reply of petitioner Paul Hunt filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 28 2020Rescheduled.
Oct 05 2020DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 10/9/2020.
Oct 05 2020Rescheduled.
Oct 13 2020DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 10/16/2020.
Oct 14 2020Rescheduled.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
William Spencer Consovoy
    Counsel of Record
Consovoy McCarthy PLLC
1600 Wilson Boulevard
Suite 700
Arlington, VA 22209

will@consovoymccarthy.com
(703) 243-9423
Party name: Paul Hunt
Attorneys for Respondents
Stephen Samuel Hamilton
    Counsel of Record
Montgomery & Andrews, P.A.
P.O. Box 2307
Santa Fe, NM 87504-2307

shamilton@montand.com
(505) 982-3873
Party name: Board of Regents of the University of New Mexico, et al.
Other
Andrew Michael Grossman
    Counsel of Record
Baker & Hostetler LLP
1050 Connecticut Avenue, N.W.
Suite 1100
Washington, DC 20036

agrossman@bakerlaw.com
2028611697
Party name: First Amendment Scholars
Kimberly Stewart Hermann
    Counsel of Record
Southeastern Legal Foundation
560 W. Crossville Rd.
Suite 104
Roswell, GA 30075-7509

khermann@southeasternlegal.org
770-977-2131
Party name: Southeastern Legal Foundation
Michael C. Hiestand
    Counsel of Record
Student Press Law Center
1608 Rhode Island Ave., NW
Suite 211
Washington, DC 20036

mike@hiestand.org
3603938916
Party name: Student Press Law Center
Jason Brett Torchinsky
    Counsel of Record
Holtzman Vogel Josefiak Torchinsky PLLC
45 North Hill Dr., Suite 100
Warrenton, VA 20186

Jtorchinsky@hvjt.law
540 341 8808
Party name: Speech First

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543