Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 19-1212
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 19-1212
Title:Chad Wolf, Acting Secretary of Homeland Security, et al., Petitioners
v.
Innovation Law Lab, et al.
Docketed:April 14, 2020
Linked with 19A960
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(19-15716)
   Decision Date:February 28, 2020
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Mar 06 2020Application (19A960) for a stay pending the filing and disposition of a petition for a writ of certiorari, submitted to Justice Kagan.
Main DocumentLower Court Orders/OpinionsProof of Service
Mar 06 2020Response to application (19A960) requested by Justice Kagan, due Monday, March 9, by 4 p.m. ET.
Mar 09 2020Response to application from respondents Innovation Law Lab, et al. filed.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Mar 09 2020Motion for leave to file amicus brief and motion for leave to file brief in compliance with Rule 33.2 filed by Immigration Reform Law Institute.
Main Document
Mar 10 2020Reply of applicants Chad Wolf, Acting Secretary of Homeland Security, et al. filed.
Proof of ServiceReply
Mar 11 2020Application (19A960) referred to the Court.
Mar 11 2020Application (19A960) granted by the Court. The application for stay presented to Justice Kagan and by her referred to the Court is granted, and the district court’s April 8, 2019 order granting a preliminary injunction is stayed pending the timely filing and disposition of a petition for a writ of certiorari. Should the petition for a writ of certiorari be denied, this stay shall terminate automatically. In the event the petition for a writ of certiorari is granted, the stay shall terminate upon the sending down of the judgment of this Court. Justice Sotomayor would deny the application.
Apr 10 2020Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due May 14, 2020)
PetitionProof of Service
Apr 22 2020Application of Innovation Law Lab, et al. for a further extension of time not accepted for filing. (April 23, 2020 - Corrected response extension request to be filed)
Apr 23 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response from May 14, 2020 to June 13, 2020, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Apr 24 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including June 15, 2020. See Rule 30.1.
May 07 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response from June 15, 2020 to July 15, 2020, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
May 07 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including July 15, 2020.
Jul 15 2020Brief of respondents Innovation Law Lab, et al. in opposition filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 29 2020DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 9/29/2020.
Jul 29 2020Reply of petitioners Chad Wolf, Acting Secretary of Homeland Security, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentProof of Service
Oct 05 2020DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 10/9/2020.
Oct 13 2020DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 10/16/2020.
Oct 19 2020Petition GRANTED.
Nov 23 2020Motion for an extension of time to file the briefs on the merits filed.
Main Document
Nov 24 2020Motion to extend the time to file the briefs on the merits granted. The time to file the joint appendix and petitioners' brief on the merits is extended to and including December 8, 2020. The time to file respondents' brief on the merits is extended to and including January 13, 2021.
Dec 08 2020Joint appendix (two volumes) filed.
Main DocumentMain DocumentProof of Service
Dec 08 2020Brief of petitioners Chad Wolf, Acting Secretary of Homeland Security, et al. filed.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Dec 31 2020SET FOR ARGUMENT on Monday, March 1, 2021.
Jan 05 2021Motion for a further extension of time to file respondents' brief on the merits filed.
Main Document
Jan 07 2021Motion to extend the time to file respondents' brief on the merits is granted and the time is extended to and including January 15, 2021.
Jan 15 2021Brief of Innovation Law Lab, et al. submitted.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Jeffrey B. Wall
    Counsel of Record
Acting Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice 950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: Chad Wolf, Acting Secretary of Homeland Security, et al.
Attorneys for Respondents
Judy Rabinovitz
    Counsel of Record
American Civil Liberties Union
125 Broad Street
18th Floor
New York, NY 10004

JRabinovitz@aclu.org
(212) 549-2618
Party name: Innovation Law Lab, et al.

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543