Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 19-1204
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 19-1204
Title:Arthrex, Inc., Petitioner
v.
Smith & Nephew, Inc., et al.
Docketed:April 9, 2020
Linked with 19A817
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Federal Circuit
   Case Numbers:(2018-1584)
   Decision Date:August 21, 2019
   Rehearing Denied:November 8, 2019
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Jan 22 2020Application (19A817) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from February 6, 2020 to April 6, 2020, submitted to The Chief Justice.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Jan 24 2020Application (19A817) granted by The Chief Justice extending the time to file until April 6, 2020.
Apr 06 2020Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due May 11, 2020)
PetitionCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
May 01 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response from May 11, 2020 to June 10, 2020, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
May 04 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including June 10, 2020, for all respondents.
Jun 08 2020Brief of respondent United States in opposition filed.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Jun 09 2020Brief of respondents Smith & Nephew, Inc. and ArthroCare Corp. in opposition filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jun 16 2020Letter waiving the 14-day waiting period for the distribution of the petition for a writ of certiorari pursuant to Rule 15.5 filed.
Main Document
Jun 17 2020DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 9/29/2020.
Jun 19 2020Reply of petitioner Arthrex, Inc. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 05 2020Petition DENIED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Jeffrey Alan Lamken
    Counsel of Record
MoloLamken LLP
The Watergate, Suite 500
600 New Hampshire Ave., N.W.
Washington, DC 20037

jlamken@mololamken.com
2025562010
Party name: Arthrex, Inc.
Attorneys for Respondents
Mark Andrew Perry
    Counsel of Record
Gibson Dunn & Crutcher, LLP
1050 Connecticut Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20036-5306

mperry@gibsondunn.com
202-887-3667
Party name: Smith & Nephew, Inc. and ArthroCare Corp.
Jeffrey B. Wall
    Counsel of Record
Acting Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: United States

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543