Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 19-1199
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 19-1199
Title:Don Higginson, Petitioner
v.
Xavier Becerra, Attorney General of California, et al.
Docketed:April 6, 2020
Linked with 19A920
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(19-55275)
   Decision Date:December 4, 2019
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Feb 19 2020Application (19A920) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from March 3, 2020 to April 2, 2020, submitted to Justice Kagan.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Feb 19 2020Application (19A920) granted by Justice Kagan extending the time to file until April 2, 2020.
Apr 02 2020Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due May 6, 2020)
PetitionCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Apr 23 2020Waiver of right of respondent Xavier Becerra to respond filed.
Main Document
Apr 30 2020Waiver of right of respondent City of Poway to respond filed.
Main DocumentProof of Service
May 01 2020Waiver of right of respondents Defendant-Intervenors California League of United Latin American Citizens, et al. to respond filed.
Main Document
May 05 2020DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 5/21/2020.
May 05 2020Brief amici curiae of Pacific Legal Foundation, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
May 06 2020Brief amici curiae of Current and Former California Local Elected Officials filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentOtherCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
May 06 2020Brief amici curiae of The Cities of Mission Viejo, Oroville, Solana Beach, South Pasadena, and Barstow, and the Town of Yucca Valley, California filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
May 20 2020Letter of May 20, 2020 from the City of Mission Viejo respecting the brief amici curiae of The Cities of Mission Viejo, et al. received.
Main Document
May 26 2020Petition DENIED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
William Spencer Consovoy
    Counsel of Record
Consovoy McCarthy PLLC
1600 Wilson Boulevard
Suite 700
Arlington, VA 22209

will@consovoymccarthy.com
(703) 243-9423
Party name: Don Higginson
Attorneys for Respondents
Alan Brian Fenstermacher
    Counsel of Record
Rutan & Tucker. LLP
611 Anton Boulevard. 14th Floor
Costa Mesa, CA 92626

afenstermacher@rutan.com
(714) 641-3452
Party name: City of Poway
Joshua A. Klein
    Counsel of Record
Office of the Solicitor General, California Department of Justice
1515 Clay Street
Suite 2000
Oakland, CA 94612-1413

joshua.klein@doj.ca.gov
510-879-0756
Party name: Xavier Becerra
Thomas Andrew Saenz
    Counsel of Record
Mexican American Legal Defense and Educational Fun
634 S. Spring Street
11th Floor
Los Angeles, CA 90014

tsaenz@maldef.org
2136292512
Party name: Defendant-Intervenors California League of United Latin American Citizens, et al.
Other
Paul Lindsey Hoffman
    Counsel of Record
Suite 1000
200 Pier Ave.
Hermosa Beach, CA 90254

hoffpaul@aol.com
3107177373
Party name: Janet Goodson, Linda Draper and Art Hatley
Marguerite Mary Leoni
    Counsel of Record
Nielsen Merksamer Parrinello Gross & Leoni, LLP
2350 Kerner Blvd
Ste 200
San Rafael, CA 94901-5595

mleoni@nmgovlaw.com
415-389-6800
Party name: The Cities of Mission Viejo, Oroville, Solana Beach, South Pasadena, and Barstow, and the Town of Yucca Valley, California
Bradley Alan Benbrook
    Counsel of Record
Benbrook Law Group
400 Capitol Mall, Suite 2530
Sacramento, CA 95814

brad@benbrooklawgroup.com
9164474900
Party name: Current and Former California Local Elected Officials
Christopher Matthew Kieser
    Counsel of Record
Pacific Legal Foundation
930 G Street
Sacramento, CA 95814

ckieser@pacificlegal.org
9165039059
Party name: Pacific Legal Foundation, Cato, CEO, Project 21, Reason Foundation and IRF

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543