Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 19-1177
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 19-1177
Title:American Institute for International Steel, Inc., et al., Petitioners
v.
United States, et al.
Docketed:March 27, 2020
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Federal Circuit
   Case Numbers:(2019-1727)
   Decision Date:February 28, 2020
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Mar 25 2020Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due April 27, 2020)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Apr 02 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response from April 27, 2020 to May 26, 2020, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Apr 02 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including May 26, 2020, for all respondents.
Apr 11 2020Blanket Consent filed by Petitioner, American Institute for International Steel, et al.
Blanket ConsentProof of Service
Apr 24 2020Brief amicus curiae of Basrai Farms filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Apr 27 2020Brief amicus curiae of The Cato Institute filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Apr 27 2020Brief amicus curiae of New Civil Liberties Alliance filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
May 26 2020Brief of respondents United States, et al. in opposition filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word Count
May 29 2020Reply of petitioners American Institute for International Steel, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jun 02 2020DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 6/18/2020.
Jun 22 2020Petition DENIED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Alan B. Morrison
    Counsel of Record
George Washington Law School
2000 H Street NW
Washington, DC 20052

abmorrison@law.gwu.edu
2029947120
Party name: American Institute for International Steel, et al.
Attorneys for Respondents
Noel J. Francisco
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: United States, et al.
Other
Jeffrey Sheldon Grimson
    Counsel of Record
Mowry & Grimson, PLLC
5335 Wisconsin Avenue, NW
Suite 810
Washington, DC 20015

jsg@mowrygrimson.com
2026883610
Party name: Basrai Farms
Richard A. Samp
    Counsel of Record
New Civil Liberties Aliance
1225 19th Street NW, Suite 450
Washington, DC 20036

rasamp@verizon.net
202-869-5210
Party name: New Civil Liberties Alliance
Ilya Shapiro
    Counsel of Record
Cato Institute
1000 Massachusetts Ave., NW
Washington, DC 20001

ishapiro@cato.org
2028420200
Party name: The Cato Institute

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543