Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 19-1166
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 19-1166
Title:Diné Citizens Against Ruining Our Environment, et al., Petitioners
v.
Bureau of Indian Affairs, et al.
Docketed:March 24, 2020
Linked with 19A934
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(17-17320)
   Decision Date:July 29, 2019
   Rehearing Denied:December 11, 2019
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Feb 21 2020Application (19A934) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from March 10, 2020 to March 24, 2020, submitted to Justice Kagan.
Main DocumentLower Court Orders/OpinionsProof of Service
Feb 22 2020Application (19A934) granted by Justice Kagan extending the time to file until March 24, 2020.
Mar 24 2020Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due April 23, 2020)
PetitionCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Apr 14 2020Motion of respondent Navajo Transitional Energy Company to extend the time to file a response from April 23, 2020 to June 4, 2020, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Apr 15 2020Motion of Arizona Public Service Company to extend the time to file a response from April 23, 2020 to June 4, 2020, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Apr 15 2020the motions to extend the time to file responses are granted and the time is extended to and including June 4, 2020, for all respondents.
Apr 16 2020Letter of April 16, 2020 from the Solicitor General filed.
Main Document

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Sarah Elaine Harrington
    Counsel of Record
Goldstein & Russell, P.C.
7475 Wisconsin Avenue
Suite 850
Bethesda, MD 20814

sh@goldsteinrussell.com
202-362-0636
Party name: Diné Citizens Against Ruining Our Environment, et al.
Attorneys for Respondents
Noel J. Francisco
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: Bureau of Indian Affairs, et al.
Sara Kobak
    Counsel of Record
Schwabe, Williamson & Wyatt, PC
1211 SW Fifth Avenue
Suite 1900
Portland, OR 97204-3795

skobak@schwabe.com
5032229981
Party name: Navajo Transitional Energy Company
Roman Martinez V
    Counsel of Record
Latham & Watkins, LLP
555 Eleventh Street, NW
Washington, DC 20004

roman.martinez@lw.com
202-637-3377
Party name: Arizona Public Service Company

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543