Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 19-114
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 19-114
Title:Douglas F. Ciolek, Petitioner
v.
New Jersey
Docketed:July 23, 2019
Lower Ct:Superior Court of New Jersey, Appellate Division
   Case Numbers:(A-3510-17t2)
   Decision Date:February 1, 2019
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:May 3, 2019

DateProceedings and Orders
Jul 18 2019Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due August 22, 2019)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 25 2019Waiver of State of New Jersey of right to respond not accepted for filing. (July 29, 2019)
Jul 29 2019Waiver of right of respondent State of New Jersey to respond filed.
Main Document
Jul 31 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 10/1/2019.
Aug 05 2019Response Requested. (Due September 4, 2019)
Aug 22 2019Brief of State of New Jersey in opposition submitted.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Douglas F. Ciolek4 North Ridge Road
Denville, NJ 07834

dciolek@rrjhlaw.com
(973) 206-2500
Party name: Douglas F. Ciolek
Attorneys for Respondent
John K. McNamara Jr.
    Counsel of Record
Office of the Morris County Prosecuter
P.O. Box 900
Morristown, NJ 07960

jmcnamara@co.morris.nj.us
9732856196
Party name: State of New Jersey

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543